This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/09/2021 at 11:18:14 (UTC).

TP-ACO, LLC v. Paradise Medical Group, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/08/2021 TP-ACO, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Paradise Medical Group, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Shelly D. Dick and Erin Wilder-Doomes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00022

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Shelly D. Dick

Referral Judge

Erin Wilder-Doomes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TP-ACO, LLC

Defendant

Paradise Medical Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James R. Clary, Jr.

406 North Fourth Street

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Casey Dale Neale

Attorney at Clary, Suba & Associates

406 North Fourth Street

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Briton Jacob Myer

Attorney at CLARY, SUBA & ASSOCIATES

406 N. 4Th Street

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Christopher Scott Suba

Attorney at Clary Suba & Associates

406 North Fourth Street

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Defendant Attorneys

Kate B Mire

Attorney at Phelps Dunbar, LLP

400 Convention Street, Suite 1100

Baton Rouge, LA 70821-4412

David Matthew Kerth

Attorney at Jones Walker LLP

445 North Boulevard, Suite 800

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Trey Kendrick Bartholomew

Attorney at Jones Walker LLP

445 North Blvd, Suite 800

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Virginia Yoder Dodd

Attorney at Phelps Dunbar - B.R.

P. O. Box 4412, Ii City Plaza - Suite 1100, 400 Convention Street

Baton Rouge, LA 70821-4412

Kevin William Welsh

Attorney at Phelps Dunbar LLP

400 Convention Street, Suite 1100

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

 

Court Documents

13 #1

Proposed Pleading; Order

#13

(#13) Joint MOTION to Extend Deadline to File Scheduling Conference Status Report by Paradise Medical Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Kerth, David) Modified on 3/3/2021 to edit the docket text (KMW). (Entered: 03/02/2021)

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Deadline to File Opposition to #9 MOTION to Dismiss and, Alternatively, MOTION to Abstain filed by TP-ACO, LLC. Response due by 3/12/2021. Replies due by 3/26/2021.. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 2/26/2021. (SWE) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

#11

(#11) Joint MOTION for Expedited Telephone Status Conference by All Plaintiffs. (Clary, James) Modified on 3/1/2021 to edit the docket text (SWE). (Entered: 02/26/2021)

10 #1

Proposed Pleading; Order

#10

(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Deadline to File Opposition to #9 MOTION to Dismiss and, Alternatively, MOTION to Abstain by TP-ACO, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Clary, James) Modified on 2/24/2021 to edit the docket text (KMW). (Entered: 02/23/2021)

9 #7

Exhibit 5

9 #6

Exhibit 4

9 #5

Exhibit 3

9 #4

Exhibit 2

9 #3

Exhibit 1

9 #2

Attachment Declaration

9 #1

Memorandum in Support

#9

(#9) MOTION to Dismiss and, Alternatively, Motion to Abstain by Paradise Medical Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Attachment Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5)(Kerth, David). Added Motion to Abstain on 2/8/2021 (ELW). Modified on 2/8/2021 to edit motion text (ELW). (Entered: 02/05/2021)

6 #1

Exhibit Proposed Pleading

#6

(#6) MOTION to Substitute David M. Kerth, Trey K. Bartholomew in place of Virginia Y. Dodd, Kate B. Mire, Kein W. Welsh as Attorney by Paradise Medical Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Pleading, #2 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Kerth, David) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

5 #1

Proposed Pleading; Order

#5

(#5) Joint MOTION to Substitute David M. Kerth; Trey K. Bartholomew in place of Virginia Y. Dodd, Kate B. Mire, Kevin W. Welsh as Attorney by Paradise Medical Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Kerth, David) (Main Document 5 replaced on 1/27/2021) (EDC). Modified on 1/27/2021 in accordance with record document 7. (EDC). (Entered: 01/21/2021)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER finding as moot #11 Motion for Conference. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 3/3/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BKA) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • Docket*** Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry) Status Report due by 3/18/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 4/1/2021 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. (BLR) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #13 Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to File Scheduling Conference Status Report for good cause shown. Status report is due 3/18/2021. Scheduling conference reset for 4/1/2021 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Erin Wilder-Doomes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 3/3/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION(S) REFERRED: #13 Joint MOTION to Extend Deadline to File Scheduling Conference Status Report. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Joint MOTION to Extend Deadline to File Scheduling Conference Status Report by Paradise Medical Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Kerth, David) Modified on 3/3/2021 to edit the docket text (KMW). (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Deadline to File Opposition to #9 MOTION to Dismiss and, Alternatively, MOTION to Abstain filed by TP-ACO, LLC. Response due by 3/12/2021. Replies due by 3/26/2021.. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 2/26/2021. (SWE) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Joint MOTION for Expedited Telephone Status Conference by All Plaintiffs. (Clary, James) Modified on 3/1/2021 to edit the docket text (SWE). (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Deadline to File Opposition to #9 MOTION to Dismiss and, Alternatively, MOTION to Abstain by TP-ACO, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Clary, James) Modified on 2/24/2021 to edit the docket text (KMW). (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Dismiss and, Alternatively, Motion to Abstain by Paradise Medical Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Attachment Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5)(Kerth, David). Added Motion to Abstain on 2/8/2021 (ELW). Modified on 2/8/2021 to edit motion text (ELW). (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #5 Updated Motion to Substitute Counsel of Record. David Matthew Kerth and Trey Kendrick Bartholomew are hereby enrolled for Paradise Medical Group, Inc. replacing Virginia Y. Dodd, Kate B. Mire, Kevin W. Welsh. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/26/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Substitute #5 Motion to Substitute Counsel of Record. The clerk is directed to replace R. Doc. 5 with R. Doc. 6-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/26/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 MOTION to Substitute David M. Kerth, Trey K. Bartholomew in place of Virginia Y. Dodd, Kate B. Mire, Kein W. Welsh as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Substitute David M. Kerth, Trey K. Bartholomew in place of Virginia Y. Dodd, Kate B. Mire, Kein W. Welsh as Attorney by Paradise Medical Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Pleading, #2 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Kerth, David) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 Joint MOTION to Substitute David M. Kerth; Trey K. Bartholomew in place of Virginia Y. Dodd, Kate B. Mire, Kevin W. Welsh as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Joint MOTION to Substitute David M. Kerth; Trey K. Bartholomew in place of Virginia Y. Dodd, Kate B. Mire, Kevin W. Welsh as Attorney by Paradise Medical Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Kerth, David) (Main Document 5 replaced on 1/27/2021) (EDC). Modified on 1/27/2021 in accordance with record document 7. (EDC). (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/18/2021 at 11:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 3/4/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/20/2021. (EDC) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER granting #2 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings to [1-1, pp. 1-8] Petition for Declaratory Judgment, filed by Paradise Medical Group, Inc., pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7(a). Paradise Medical Group, Inc.'s responsive pleadings are due 2/5/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/14/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EWD) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Paradise Medical Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; "Order")(Dodd, Virginia) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number 702,566. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2231204), filed by Paradise Medical Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" -- State Court Record, #2 Exhibit "B" -- Civil Cover Sheet)(Mire, Kate) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Paradise Medical Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Casey Dale Neale

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher Scott Suba