This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/09/2021 at 07:53:20 (UTC).

Towslee v. Equifax Information Services, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/10/2021 Towslee filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Equifax Information Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charles A. Pannell, Jr and Christopher C. Bly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01967

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles A. Pannell, Jr

Referral Judge

Christopher C. Bly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Beatrice Towslee

Defendant

Equifax Information Services, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph Powell McClelland, III

Attorney at Law Firm of Joseph P. McClelland, LLC

545 N. Mcdonough Street, Suite 210

Decatur, GA 30030

Defendant Attorney

Esther Slater McDonald

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw, LLP-Atl

Suite 2500, 1075 Peachtree Street Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC. (McDonald, Esther) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#5

(#5) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDonald, Esther) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

#4

(#4) Certificate of Interested Persons by Beatrice Towslee. (McClelland, Joseph) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

#3

(#3) Return of Service Executed by Beatrice Towslee. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 5/24/2021, answer due 6/14/2021. (McClelland, Joseph) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC. (eop) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Beatrice Towslee. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-10961493) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 05/10/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: Defendant's motion for an extension of time #5 is GRANTED. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by July 29, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on June 10, 2021. (CCB) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC. (McDonald, Esther) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDonald, Esther) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interested Persons by Beatrice Towslee. (McClelland, Joseph) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Return of Service Executed by Beatrice Towslee. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 5/24/2021, answer due 6/14/2021. (McClelland, Joseph) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC. (eop) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Beatrice Towslee. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-10961493) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Equifax Information Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Powell McClelland, III