This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/25/2022 at 08:07:17 (UTC).

Township Officials of Illinois Management Association et al v. Lenovo (United States), Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/26/2022 Township Officials of Illinois Management Association filed a Property - Real Property Product Liability lawsuit against Lenovo United States , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Iain D. Johnston and Margaret J. Schneider. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-50339

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Real Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Iain D. Johnston

Referral Judge

Margaret J. Schneider

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Township Officials of Illinois Management Association

Rockford Township

Defendants

LG Chem America, Inc.

Lenovo (United States), Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven R. Johnson

Margaret Mary Molloy

Defendant Attorney

Daniel William McGrath

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant LG Chem America, Inc. by Daniel William McGrath (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant LG Chem America, Inc. by Daniel William McGrath (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

#4

(#4) Rule 7.1 Statement by LG Chem America, Inc. (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Rockford Township, Township Officials of Illinois Management Association by Steven R. Johnson (Johnson, Steven) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Rockford Township, Township Officials of Illinois Management Association by Margaret Mary Molloy (Molloy, Margaret) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

#7

(#7) Certification of Counsel as to Procedural Rule by LG Chem America, Inc. (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

#8

(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Margaret J. Schneider: Defendant LG Chem America, Inc. is directed to file its answer to Plaintiffs' complaint in a separate docket entry. Initial telephonic status hearing set for 12/15/22 at 10:15 a.m. The Court will be utilizing the Cisco Webex platform. Public access is available via the following call-in number: 1-(650)-479-3207 and enter ACCESS CODE: 180-822-8235#. Plaintiff and defense counsel with full knowledge of the case must appear at the initial status hearing. The parties shall jointly complete the PDF fillable initial status report form found on Judge Schneider's webpage and file by 12/06/22. Plaintiffs must report in the initial status report their efforts to serve Defendant Lenovo (United States), Inc. Counsel of record will receive an email the day prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions. Mailed notice. (jxk) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by LG Chem America, Inc.(McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

#10

(#10) Request to Waive service of Summons by Rockford Township (Johnson, Steven) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Request to Waive service of Summons by Rockford Township (Johnson, Steven) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by LG Chem America, Inc.(McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Margaret J. Schneider: Defendant LG Chem America, Inc. is directed to file its answer to Plaintiffs' complaint in a separate docket entry. Initial telephonic status hearing set for 12/15/22 at 10:15 a.m. The Court will be utilizing the Cisco Webex platform. Public access is available via the following call-in number: 1-(650)-479-3207 and enter ACCESS CODE: 180-822-8235#. Plaintiff and defense counsel with full knowledge of the case must appear at the initial status hearing. The parties shall jointly complete the PDF fillable initial status report form found on Judge Schneider's webpage and file by 12/06/22. Plaintiffs must report in the initial status report their efforts to serve Defendant Lenovo (United States), Inc. Counsel of record will receive an email the day prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions. Mailed notice. (jxk) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certification of Counsel as to Procedural Rule by LG Chem America, Inc. (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Rockford Township, Township Officials of Illinois Management Association by Margaret Mary Molloy (Molloy, Margaret) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Rockford Township, Township Officials of Illinois Management Association by Steven R. Johnson (Johnson, Steven) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketMAILED notice of removal to counsel for plaintiffs. (jp, ) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jp, ) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Iain D. Johnston and Honorable Margaret J. Schneider. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Margaret J. Schneider. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jp, ) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Rule 7.1 Statement by LG Chem America, Inc. (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant LG Chem America, Inc. by Daniel William McGrath (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant LG Chem America, Inc. by Daniel William McGrath (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Winnebago County, case number (2022 LA 0000236) filed by LG Chem America, Inc. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19878272. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less