This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 05:00:19 (UTC).

Township of Barnegat v. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD et al

Case Summary

On 11/01/2019 Township of Barnegat filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-OP-45925

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)

 

Party Details

Defendants

McKesson Corporation

Advantage Logistics

Mallinckrodt LLC

Mallinckrodt PLC

River City Pharma

Watson Laboratories Inc.

Allergan PLC

Keysource Medical, Inc.

Teva Pharmeceuticals USA, Inc.

Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.

Actavis LLC

H.D. Smith

Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Kinray Inc.

Rite Aid Corp.

Allergan Finance LLC

CVS Pharmacy

Harvard Drug Group, L.L.C.

Cardinal Health Inc.

26 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

William David Wright

Attorney at The Law Office of William Wright LLC

566 E. Bay Ave., Suite 1

Manahawkin, NJ 08050

 

Court Documents

4 #1

*Restricted*

#4

(#4) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New Jersey. Case number 3:19-cv-18442. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 11/01/2019)

#3

(#3) Order of MDL Panel (CTO-115) transferring case to the USDC for the Northern District of Ohio. (dm ) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.] (Entered: 10/21/2019)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. F/K/A WATSON PHARMA, INC., ACTAVIS, LLC, ADVANTAGE LOGISTICS, ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC, ALLERGAN PLC, AMERICAN DRUG STORES, AMERICAN DRUG STORES, INC., AMERICAN SALES COMPANY, AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, ANDA, INC., ASSOCIATED PHARMACIES, INC., CARDINAL HEALTH, INC., CEDARDALE DISTRIBUTORS, LLC, CVS PHARMACY, ECKERD CORPORATION, ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC., ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., H.D. SMITH, HARVARD DRUG GROUP, LLC, HENRY SCHEIN, INC., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JOHNSON AND JOHNSON, KEYSOURCE MEDICAL, KINRAY, INC., MALLINCKRODT LLC, MALLINCKRODT PLC, MASTERS DRUG COMPANY, MCKESSON CORPORATION, MOORE MEDICAL, LLC, NORAMCO, INC., ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., RITE AID CORP., RIVER CITY PHARMA, ROCHESTER DRUG COOPERATIVE, INC., SHOPRITE SUPERMARKETS, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TOP RX, INC., WAKEFERN FOOD CORPORATION, WAL-MART STORES, INC., WALGREEN COMPANY, WATSON LABORATORIES, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (km, ) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.] (Entered: 09/30/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet JS44

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9994249) with JURY DEMAND, filed by BARNEGAT TOWNSHIP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet JS44)(WRIGHT, WILLIAM) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.] (Entered: 09/27/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New Jersey. Case number 3:19-cv-18442. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order of MDL Panel (CTO-115) transferring case to the USDC for the Northern District of Ohio. (dm ) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.] (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. F/K/A WATSON PHARMA, INC., ACTAVIS, LLC, ADVANTAGE LOGISTICS, ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC, ALLERGAN PLC, AMERICAN DRUG STORES, AMERICAN DRUG STORES, INC., AMERICAN SALES COMPANY, AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, ANDA, INC., ASSOCIATED PHARMACIES, INC., CARDINAL HEALTH, INC., CEDARDALE DISTRIBUTORS, LLC, CVS PHARMACY, ECKERD CORPORATION, ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC., ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., H.D. SMITH, HARVARD DRUG GROUP, LLC, HENRY SCHEIN, INC., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JOHNSON AND JOHNSON, KEYSOURCE MEDICAL, KINRAY, INC., MALLINCKRODT LLC, MALLINCKRODT PLC, MASTERS DRUG COMPANY, MCKESSON CORPORATION, MOORE MEDICAL, LLC, NORAMCO, INC., ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., RITE AID CORP., RIVER CITY PHARMA, ROCHESTER DRUG COOPERATIVE, INC., SHOPRITE SUPERMARKETS, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TOP RX, INC., WAKEFERN FOOD CORPORATION, WAL-MART STORES, INC., WALGREEN COMPANY, WATSON LABORATORIES, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (km, ) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.] (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #1 Complaint submitted by William Wright on 9/27/2019 appears to have address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (km) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.] (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information: List only the Party name, not the address information. If an alias is listed on the complaint, please add to the parties listed on the docket. . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (km) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.] (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi added. (km) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.] (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9994249) with JURY DEMAND, filed by BARNEGAT TOWNSHIP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet JS44)(WRIGHT, WILLIAM) [Transferred from njd on 11/1/2019.] (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kinray, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where RITE AID CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where RIVER CITY PHARMA is a litigant

Latest cases where KEYSOURCE MEDICAL is a litigant