This case was last updated from PACER on 11/15/2020 at 09:07:14 (UTC).

Townsend v. The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 09/16/2020 Townsend filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kristen L. Mix. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02809

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kristen L. Mix

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Karen Townsend

Defendant

Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company, The

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kerri Jane Rugh

Attorney at Levin Sitcoff PC

1512 Larimer Street, Suite 650

Denver, CO 80202

Bradley Aaron Levin

Attorney at Levin Sitcoff PC

1512 Larimer Street, Suite 650

Denver, CO 80202

Defendant Attorneys

Marilyn S. Chappell

Attorney at Sweetbaum Sands Anderson PC

1125 Seventeenth Street, Suite 2100

Denver, CO 80202

Jon F. Sands

Attorney at Sweetbaum Sands Anderson PC

1125 Seventeenth Street, Suite 2100

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company, The All parties consent.. (Sands, Jon) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#13

(#13) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/14/20 GRANTING #12 Joint Motion to Reschedule the Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 1/12/2021. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 11/5/20 at 9:30 AM is VACATED and RESET to 1/19/2021 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#12

(#12) Joint MOTION to Reset Scheduling/Planning Conference by Plaintiff Karen Townsend. (Rugh, Kerri) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #5 Complaint and Jury Demand by Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company, The.(Sands, Jon) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Bradley Aaron Levin on behalf of Karen TownsendAttorney Bradley Aaron Levin added to party Karen Townsend(pty:pla) (Levin, Bradley) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kerri Jane Rugh on behalf of Karen TownsendAttorney Kerri Jane Rugh added to party Karen Townsend(pty:pla) (Rugh, Kerri) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

8 #2

Attachment 2

8 #1

Attachment 1

#8

(#8) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/17/20 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 10/29/2020. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 11/5/2020 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (nmarb, ) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#7

(#7) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cpomm, ) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint upon The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company on 08/18/2020, filed by Plaintiff Karen Townsend (cpomm, ) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#5

(#5) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company, filed by Karen Townsend.(cpomm, ) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jon F. Sands on behalf of The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance CompanyAttorney Jon F. Sands added to party The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Sands, Jon) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company from Denver County District Court, Case Number 2020CV32719. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7490946), filed by The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Chappell, Marilyn) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #14 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/29/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company, The All parties consent.. (Sands, Jon) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/14/20 GRANTING #12 Joint Motion to Reschedule the Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 1/12/2021. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 11/5/20 at 9:30 AM is VACATED and RESET to 1/19/2021 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Joint MOTION to Reset Scheduling/Planning Conference by Plaintiff Karen Townsend. (Rugh, Kerri) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #5 Complaint and Jury Demand by Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company, The.(Sands, Jon) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Bradley Aaron Levin on behalf of Karen TownsendAttorney Bradley Aaron Levin added to party Karen Townsend(pty:pla) (Levin, Bradley) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kerri Jane Rugh on behalf of Karen TownsendAttorney Kerri Jane Rugh added to party Karen Townsend(pty:pla) (Rugh, Kerri) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/17/20 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 10/29/2020. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 11/5/2020 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (nmarb, ) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cpomm, ) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint upon The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company on 08/18/2020, filed by Plaintiff Karen Townsend (cpomm, ) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company, filed by Karen Townsend.(cpomm, ) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry (cpomm, ) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • Docket(#3) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (cpomm, ) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jon F. Sands on behalf of The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance CompanyAttorney Jon F. Sands added to party The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Sands, Jon) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company from Denver County District Court, Case Number 2020CV32719. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7490946), filed by The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Chappell, Marilyn) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less