This case was last updated from PACER on 11/29/2020 at 10:32:00 (UTC).

Townsend v. Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 09/30/2020 Townsend filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel P. Jordan, III, F. Keith Ball and Tom S. Lee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00632

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

F. Keith Ball

Presiding Judges

Daniel P. Jordan, III

Tom S. Lee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Danny Townsend

Defendants

Tiffany Brown

Keiona Green

Keisha Gordon

John Does 1-5

Cory Brown

Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company

Krystel Brown

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Terris C. Harris

Attorney at THE COCHRAN FIRM - Ridgeland

198 Charmant Place, Suite 2

Ridgeland, MS 39157

Defendant Attorneys

William Lock Morton, III

Attorney at UPSHAW, WILLIAMS, BIGGERS & BECKHAM, LLP-Ridgeland

713 South Pear Orchard, Suite 102, P. O. Box 3080 (39158-3080)

Ridgeland, MS 39157

Joseph W. Gill

Attorney at CURRIE, JOHNSON & MYERS, PA - Jackson

P. O. Box 750, 1044 River Oaks Drive (39232)

Jackson, MS 39205-0750

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Gill, Joseph) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#12

(#12) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Sever , #7 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #6 MOTION to Dismiss by Danny Townsend (Harris, Terris) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#11

(#11) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - Case reassigned to District Judge Tom S. Lee for all further proceedings and Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 11/2/2020 (ND) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#10

(#10) MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Danny Townsend (Harris, Terris) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Danny Townsend (Harris, Terris) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

8 #2

Exhibit B - Case Mgmt Order

8 #1

Exhibit A -Interpleader - DJ Complaint

#8

(#8) MOTION to Sever by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -Interpleader - DJ Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Case Mgmt Order)(Gill, Joseph) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

#7

(#7) MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Gill, Joseph) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

6 #5

Exhibit E - Townsend's 2nd Amended Complaint

6 #4

Exhibit D - Federal CMO

6 #3

Exhibit C - Answer to Complaint

6 #2

Exhibit B - 2019 Order denying MTD

6 #1

Exhibit A - Interpleader - DJ Complaint

#6

(#6) MOTION to Dismiss by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Interpleader - DJ Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - 2019 Order denying MTD, #3 Exhibit C - Answer to Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Federal CMO, #5 Exhibit E - Townsend's 2nd Amended Complaint)(Gill, Joseph) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

#5

(#5) Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 11/12/2020 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

#4

(#4) State Court Record by Defendant Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company Volumes 1 (Morton, William) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,,,, by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Gill, Joseph) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ONLY ORDER granting #13 UNOPPOSED Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Response due by 11/30/2020. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE FROM THIS COURT. Issued by District Judge Tom S. Lee on 11/16/20 (LWE) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Gill, Joseph) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ONLY ORDER granting #12 UNOPPOSED Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #6 MOTION to Dismiss , #8 MOTION to Sever . Response due by 11/17/2020. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE FROM THIS COURT. Issued by District Judge Tom S. Lee on 11/2/20 (LWE) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Sever , #7 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #6 MOTION to Dismiss by Danny Townsend (Harris, Terris) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - Case reassigned to District Judge Tom S. Lee for all further proceedings and Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 11/2/2020 (ND) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT-ONLY ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY except for remand-related discovery pending a ruling by the district judge on the Motion to Remand, at docket no. #9 . The telephonic case management conference set for November 12, 2020, is cancelled. No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 11/2/2020. (JEJ) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Danny Townsend (Harris, Terris) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Danny Townsend (Harris, Terris) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Sever by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -Interpleader - DJ Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Case Mgmt Order)(Gill, Joseph) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Gill, Joseph) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Interpleader - DJ Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - 2019 Order denying MTD, #3 Exhibit C - Answer to Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Federal CMO, #5 Exhibit E - Townsend's 2nd Amended Complaint)(Gill, Joseph) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 11/12/2020 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #3 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company answer due 10/21/2020. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 10/6/2020. (dcw) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) State Court Record by Defendant Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company Volumes 1 (Morton, William) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,,,, by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Gill, Joseph) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph W. Gill on behalf of Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Gill, Joseph) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Hinds County, MS, case number 20-486. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid; receipt number 34643060950) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Fed. Court Compl., #2 Exhibit B - Order Denying Mot. to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit C - Order on Motion for Default Judg., #4 Exhibit D - Townsend Answer, #5 Exhibit E - CMO, #6 Exhibit F - State Court Compl., #7 Exhibit G - Amended State Court Compl., #8 Exhibit H - State Court Pleadings, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(ND) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONWIDE MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Terris C. Harris(Designation Retained)