This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/12/2021 at 07:16:09 (UTC).

Townsend v. Ensite USA, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/13/2021 Townsend filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Ensite USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is David J. Hale. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00386

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David J. Hale

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Townsend

Defendant

Ensite USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Frank J. Mazzaferro

Attorney at Fitapelli & Schaffer, LLP

28 Liberty Street, 30Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

Joseph A. Fitapelli

Attorney at Fitapelli & Schaffer, LLP

28 Liberty Street, 30Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

Richard J. Burch

Attorney at Bruckner Burch PLLC

11 Greenway Plaza #3025

Houston, TX 77046

Defendant Attorneys

Don Fogel

Attorney at Fogel & McEvily, LLP

514 Hunters Park Lane

Houston, TX 77024

Hannah B. Kembel

Attorney at Stoll Keenon Ogden PLLC - Louisville

500 W. Jefferson Street, Suite 2000

Louisville, KY 40202

John T. Hays

Attorney at Eversheds Sutherland (US) LLP - Houston

1001 Fannin, Suite 3700

Houston, TX 77002

John O. Sheller

Attorney at Stoll Keenon Ogden PLLC - Louisville

500 W. Jefferson Street, Suite 2000

Louisville, KY 40202

Marlene C. Williams

Attorney at Eversheds Sutherland (US) LLP - Houston

1001 Fannin, Suite 3700

Houston, TX 77002

Scott R. McLaughlin

Attorney at Eversheds Sutherland (US) LLP - Houston

1001 Fannin, Suite 3700

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#20

19 #1

Proposed Order

#19

18 #5

Exhibit A (part 5) - Motion to Consolidate

18 #4

Exhibit A (part 4) - Motion to Consolidate

18 #3

Exhibit A (part 3) - Motion to Consolidate

18 #2

Exhibit A (part 2) - Motion to Consolidate

18 #1

Exhibit A (part 1) - Motion to Consolidate

#18

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Summons Tendered

1 #4

Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C - Tolling

1 #2

Exhibit B - Notice of Consent

1 #1

Exhibit A - Handbook Excerpts

#1

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ensite USA, Inc. (Sheller, John) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION to Defer by Defendant Ensite USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sheller, John) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Motion to Consolidate by Ensite USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (part 1) - Motion to Consolidate, #2 Exhibit A (part 2) - Motion to Consolidate, #3 Exhibit A (part 3) - Motion to Consolidate, #4 Exhibit A (part 4) - Motion to Consolidate, #5 Exhibit A (part 5) - Motion to Consolidate) (Sheller, John) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Ensite USA, Inc. (Sheller, John) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 8/2/2021 granting #12 Proposed Agreed Order. EnSite's deadline to file its response to the Complaint is 8/4/2021. cc: Counsel (DLW) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah B. Kembel on behalf of Ensite USA, Inc. (Kembel, Hannah) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Proposed Agreed Order by Ensite USA, Inc. (Sheller, John) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by John O. Sheller on behalf of Ensite USA, Inc. (Sheller, John) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Proposed Agreed Order Extending Defendant's Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Michael Townsend. (Burch, Richard) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) TEXT ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 7/15/2021 granting #9 Motion for Frank J. Mazzaferro to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting #10 Motion for Joseph A. Fitapelli to Appear Pro Hac Vice. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(NWT) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Joseph A. Fitapelli to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $125, receipt number 0644-3380815) by Plaintiff Michael Townsend (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Burch, Richard) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Frank J. Mazzaferro to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $125, receipt number 0644-3380807) by Plaintiff Michael Townsend (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Burch, Richard) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) TEXT ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 7/6/2021 granting #7 Motion for Richard J. (Rex) Burch to Appear Pro Hac Vice. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(NWT) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Richard J. (Rex) Burch to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $125, receipt number 0644-3373395) by Plaintiff Michael Townsend (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (Burch, Richard) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Richard J. Burch re Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 7/9/2021. (KJA) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Joseph A. Fitapelli re Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 7/13/2021. (KJA) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Frank J. Mazzaferro re Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 7/13/2021. (KJA) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Ensite USA, Inc. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (MNM) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Ensite USA, Inc. Filing fee $402, receipt number 0644-3362073, filed by Michael Townsend. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Handbook Excerpts, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Consent, #3 Exhibit C - Tolling, #4 Cover Sheet, #5 Summons Tendered) (MNM) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EnSite USA, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John O. Sheller(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marlene C. Williams

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Thomas Hays