This case was last updated from PACER on 02/16/2021 at 10:40:02 (UTC).

Townhouse Hotel, LLC. v. Universal Investments Unlimited, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/18/2020 Townhouse Hotel, LLC filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Universal Investments Unlimited, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert N. Scola, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-25153

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert N. Scola, Jr

 

Party Details

Appellant

Townhouse Hotel, LLC.

Appellee

Universal Investments Unlimited, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Scott Alan Orth

Attorney at Law Office of Scott Alan Orth P.A.

3860 Sheridan Street, Suite A

Hollywood, FL 33021

Appellee Attorney

Luis Salazar

Attorney at Salazar Law

2000 Ponce De Leon Boulevard, Penthouse

Coral Gables, FL 33134

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ORDER Denying Motion for Reconsideration re #10 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 2/5/2021. See attached document for full details. (ebz) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

#18

(#18) Order Setting Oral Argument and Briefing Schedule in Bankruptcy Appeal Argument on Bankruptcy Appeal set for 5/26/2021 08:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr.. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 2/5/2021. See attached document for full details. (ebz) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

#15

RESTRICTED

#14

RESTRICTED

#13

RESTRICTED

12 #3

Statement of Issues

12 #2

Appellant's Designation

12 #1

Docket Sheet

#12

(#12) Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Townhouse Hotel, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Appellant's Designation, #3 Statement of Issues)(dcn) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

#11

(#11) RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION for Reconsideration re 7 Order on Motion to Stay,,,,,, 9 Order on Motion to Stay,, filed by Universal Investments Unlimited, Inc.. Replies due by 1/13/2021. (Salazar, Luis) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

#10

(#10) MOTION for Reconsideration re 7 Order on Motion to Stay,,,,,, 9 Order on Motion to Stay,, by Townhouse Hotel, LLC.. (Orth, Scott) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal by Townhouse Hotel, LLC.. Responses due by 1/6/2021 (Orth, Scott) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

#6

(#6) Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Townhouse Hotel, LLC. (Orth, Scott) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal by Townhouse Hotel, LLC.. Responses due by 1/4/2021 (Orth, Scott) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

#2

(#2) Bankruptcy Transmittal of re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Townhouse Hotel, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(dcn) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

#1

(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (received), Bankruptcy Court case number 20-19997-RAM, filed by Townhouse Hotel, LLC..(dcn) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Order Setting Oral Argument and Briefing Schedule in Bankruptcy Appeal Argument on Bankruptcy Appeal set for 5/26/2021 08:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr.. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 2/5/2021. See attached document for full details. (ebz) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER Denying Motion for Reconsideration re #10 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 2/5/2021. See attached document for full details. (ebz) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • Docket(#16) Bankruptcy Notice of Entry pursuant to Rule 8018 and NOTICE TO ATTORNEY - Pursuant to the Southern District of Florida Local Rules, and the Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure, the Appellant has 30 days after the docketing of the Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court to serve and file a brief. The Appellee shall serve and file a response brief within 30 days after service of Appellant's brief. The Appellant shall serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the Appelle's brief. Appellant Brief due by 2/19/2021. (jc) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 11/5/2020 before Judge Robert A. Mark, 55 pages, Court Reporter: Oullette and Mauldin. Telephone number: (305) 358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/26/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/19/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/19/2021. (dcn) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 10/15/2020 before Judge Robert A. Mark, 39 pages, Court Reporter: Oullette and Mauldin. Telephone number: (305) 358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/26/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/19/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/19/2021. (dcn) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 12/4/2020 before Judge Robert A. Mark, 83 pages, Court Reporter: Oullette and Mauldin. Telephone number: (305) 358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/15/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/8/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/8/2021. (dcn) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Townhouse Hotel, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Appellant's Designation, #3 Statement of Issues)(dcn) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION for Reconsideration re 7 Order on Motion to Stay,,,,,, 9 Order on Motion to Stay,, filed by Universal Investments Unlimited, Inc.. Replies due by 1/13/2021. (Salazar, Luis) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Reconsideration re 7 Order on Motion to Stay,,,,,, 9 Order on Motion to Stay,, by Townhouse Hotel, LLC.. (Orth, Scott) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court denies #8 the Appellant's motion to stay pending appeal. Previously, in a paperless order on December 21, 2020, the Court denied what appears to be the exact same motion for a stay because the Appellant failed to comply with Local Rule 7.1(a)(3). Without asking the Court to reconsider that ruling, the Appellant has simply refiled the same motion, with the only apparent difference being that the second motion actually contains a Rule 7.1 conferral certification. Nowhere in its ruling did the Court invite the Appellant to simply refile its motion, albeit with its previous error corrected. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (kbe) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal by Townhouse Hotel, LLC.. Responses due by 1/6/2021 (Orth, Scott) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court denies #5 Appellant Townhouse Hotel LLC's motion for a stay pending appeal because the motion does not contain a pre-filing-conference certification, as required by the Court's Local Rules 7.1 and 87.4(d). Local Rule 7.1(a)(3) requires an attorney filing a motion to first confer with all parties or non-parties who may be affected by the relief sought in a good-faith effort to resolve by agreement the issues raised in the motion. The filing attorney must then include in the motion a statement explaining to the Court that (1) all or some of the issues raised in the motion are unopposed; (2) counsel conferred but could not agree on all or some of the issues raised in the motion; or (3) counsel diligently attempted to confer but was unable to reach the opposing counsel. S.D. Fla. L.R. 7.1(a)(3). "The purpose of the rule is to ensure judicial economy and prevent courts from considering issues the parties could agree on independently, and to ascertain whether the Court need wait for a response from the opposing party before deciding the motion." Aguilar v. United Floor Crew, Inc. , No. 14-CIV-61605, 2014 WL 6751663, at *1 (S.D. Fla. Dec. 1, 2014) (Bloom, J.); see also, Yurovskiy v. Impex Point, LLC, 18-81288-CIV, 2020 WL 4677311, at *5 (S.D. Fla. Aug. 12, 2020) (Matthewman, J.) (noting that, had the movant "taken the time to fully and properly confer prior to filing his motion[,] he would have likely been apprised of the frivolousness and falsity of his positions"). Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (kbe) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Townhouse Hotel, LLC. (Orth, Scott) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal by Townhouse Hotel, LLC.. Responses due by 1/4/2021 (Orth, Scott) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • Docket(#4) New Bankruptcy Appeal Case Filed - Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Administrative Order 2015-9 and Amendments to Federal Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rule 87.4 Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals (jc) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • Docket(#3) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jc) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Bankruptcy Transmittal of re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Townhouse Hotel, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(dcn) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (received), Bankruptcy Court case number 20-19997-RAM, filed by Townhouse Hotel, LLC..(dcn) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less