This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/31/2021 at 08:06:51 (UTC).

Towner et al v. Glaxo Smith Kline, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/01/2021 Towner filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Glaxo Smith Kline, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Bruce E. Reinhart and Robin L. Rosenberg. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:21-CV-82008

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Bruce E. Reinhart

Presiding Judge

Robin L. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

David Towner

Brandi Towner

Defendants

Glaxo Smith Kline, LLC

Boehringer Ingelham Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

SANOFI-AVENTIC U.S. LLC

Chattem, Inc.

Sanofi U.S. Services Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher R. LoPalo

Attorney at Napoli Shkolnik, PLLC

400 Broadhollow Road, Suite 305

Melville, NY 11747

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 11/18/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 11/18/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • Docket(#3) MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82008-RLR Towner et al v. Glaxo Smith Kline, LLC et al with documents 1-2. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. Clerks Note: JPML notified (mc) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCases associated 9:20-md-2924-RLR. (mc) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15137823, filed by David Towner, Brandi Towner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GLAXO SMITH KLINE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Chattem Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC is a litigant