This case was last updated from PACER on 07/10/2019 at 09:38:12 (UTC).

Town of Portsmouth v. Alviti et al

Case Summary

On 04/13/2019 Town of Portsmouth filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against Alviti. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lincoln D. Almond and John J. McConnell, Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00189

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lincoln D. Almond

Presiding Judge

John J. McConnell, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Town of Portsmouth

Intervenor Plaintiff

Town of Bristol, RI

Defendants

Administrator Carlos Machado

Executive Director Buddy Croft

Deputy Administrator Brandye L. Hendrickson

Rhode Island Department of Transportation

Rhode Island Turnpike and Bridge Authority

Federal Highway Administration

Director Peter Alviti, Jr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Terence J. Tierney

35 Touro Street

Newport, RI 02840

Kevin P. Gavin

Attorney at Law Office of Kevin P. Gavin

31 Harrington Avenue

Portsmouth, RI 02871

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorney

Andrew M. Teitz

Attorney at Ursillo, Teitz & Ritch, Ltd.

2 Williams Street, 331-2222, Fax: 751-2427

Providence, RI 02903

Defendant Attorneys

Brian J. Lamoureux

Attorney at Pannone Lopes Devereaux & O'Gara LLC

1301 Atwood Avenue, Suite 215 N, 824-5100, Fax: 824-5123

Johnston, RI 02919

William E. O'Gara

Attorney at PANNONE LOPES DEVEREAUX & O'GARA LLC

1301 Atwood Avenue, Suite 215 N, 824-5100, Fax: 824-5123

Johnston, RI 02919

 

Court Documents

#17

#16

#15

14 #3

Exhibit Exhibit B to motion - proposed intervenor complaint, red-lined version

14 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A to motion - proposed intervenor complaint

14 #1

Supporting Memorandum memo in support of motion to intervene

#14

13 #8

Croft

#13

#3

#2

1 #6

Exhibit April 2, 2019 letter

1 #5

Exhibit March 7, 2019 letter

1 #4

Exhibit January 18, 2019 letter

1 #3

Exhibit April 22, 2013 Revised ROD

1 #2

Exhibit March 15, 2013 letter

1 #1

Exhibit 2003 ROD

#1

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER entering #17 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice filed by Town of Portsmouth - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 5/21/2019. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Town of Portsmouth (Gavin, Kevin) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER granting as unopposed #14 Motion to Intervene by the Town of Bristol - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 5/6/2019. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Appearance by William E. O'Gara on behalf of Buddy Croft, Rhode Island Turnpike and Bridge Authority (O'Gara, William) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Lamoureux on behalf of Buddy Croft, Rhode Island Turnpike and Bridge Authority (Lamoureux, Brian) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) First MOTION to Intervene as Plaintiff filed by Town of Bristol, RI. Responses due by 5/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum memo in support of motion to intervene, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to motion - proposed intervenor complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to motion - proposed intervenor complaint, red-lined version)(Teitz, Andrew) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Summons Issued as to Peter Alviti, Jr., Buddy Croft, Federal Highway Administration, Brandye L. Hendrickson, Carlos Machado, Rhode Island Department of Transportation, Rhode Island Turnpike and Bridge Authority., Summons Issued as to Peter Alviti, Jr., Buddy Croft, Federal Highway Administration, Brandye L. Hendrickson, Carlos Machado, Rhode Island Department of Transportation, Rhode Island Turnpike and Bridge Authority, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Machado, #2 Hendrickson, #3 Federal Highway, #4 RI Turnpike, #5 US Attorney, #6 Atty General, #7 Alviti, #8 Croft)(Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Summons Request filed by Town of Portsmouth. (Gavin, Kevin) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Summons Request filed by Town of Portsmouth. (Gavin, Kevin) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Summons Request filed by Town of Portsmouth. (Gavin, Kevin) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Request filed by Town of Portsmouth. (Gavin, Kevin) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Request filed by Town of Portsmouth. (Gavin, Kevin) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Request filed by Town of Portsmouth. (Gavin, Kevin) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Request filed by Town of Portsmouth. (Gavin, Kevin) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Request filed by Town of Portsmouth. (Gavin, Kevin) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Civil Cover Sheet filed by Town of Portsmouth. Regarding New Case: #1 Complaint, Corrective Docket Entry, . (Gavin, Kevin) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding: #1 Complaint. This case has been electronically filed and processed, however, after a quality control review the following deficiencies were found: Civil Cover Sheet not attached. The filer is directed to file a Civil Cover Sheet within one day. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1348341 ), filed by Town of Portsmouth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2003 ROD, #2 Exhibit March 15, 2013 letter, #3 Exhibit April 22, 2013 Revised ROD, #4 Exhibit January 18, 2019 letter, #5 Exhibit March 7, 2019 letter, #6 Exhibit April 2, 2019 letter)(Gavin, Kevin) (Entered: 04/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Federal Highway Administration is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew M. Teitz