This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/24/2023 at 07:08:26 (UTC).

Town of Marshfield v. 3M Company et al

Case Summary

On 02/23/2023 Town of Marshfield filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against 3M Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard M Gergel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00725

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard M Gergel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Town of Marshfield

Defendants

3M Company

AGC Inc

Raytheon Technologies Corporation

Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co.

Angus Fire

AGC Chemical Americas, Inc.

Asahi Glass Co Ltd

Archroma Management LLC

Archroma US Inc

Arkema Inc

BASF Corporation

Buckeye Fire Protection Co.

Carrier Global Corporation

ChemDesign Products Inc

Chemguard Inc

Chemicals Inc

Chubb Fire LTD

Clariant Corp.

Corteva Inc

15 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew J Cvitanovic

Brandon J Taylor

Carla Burke Pickrel

Cary L McDougal

Christina Cossich

Darren D Sumich

David A Parsiola

Jason J Julius

Luana N Smith

Philip F Cossich

Richard M. Sandman

Scott Summy

Defendant Attorney

Kevin P. Polansky

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Category Form

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP. (Polansky, Kevin) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/24/2023.] (Entered: 02/01/2023)

#3

(#3) Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP.(Polansky, Kevin) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/24/2023.] (Entered: 02/01/2023)

#7

(#7) STATE COURT Record. (Polansky, Kevin) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/24/2023.] (Entered: 02/07/2023)

#10

(#10) Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 118 in MDL Case 2873 received from District of South Carolina requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings (Danieli, Chris) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/24/2023.] (Entered: 02/23/2023)

12 #12

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

12 #1

*Restricted*

#15

(#15) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • Docket(#14) MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Massachusetts (associated as of 2/23/2023), 1:23-cv-10268, Town of Marshfield v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-00725-RMG (sshe, ) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Case transferred in from District of Massachusetts; Case Number 1:23-cv-10268. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • Docket(#11) Case transferred to the District of South Carolina pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order entered by the MDL Panel on 2/21/2023. Case file electronically extracted to the Clerk in that district. (Danieli, Chris) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/24/2023.] (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 118 in MDL Case 2873 received from District of South Carolina requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings (Danieli, Chris) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/24/2023.] (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • Docket(#9) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton added. Judge George A. OToole, Jr no longer assigned to case. (Danieli, Chris) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/24/2023.] (Entered: 02/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • Docket(#8) Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER OF RECUSAL.Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455, I recuse myself from participation in this matter and direct the Clerk to reassign the case randomly. (de Oliveira, Flaviana) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/24/2023.] (Entered: 02/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STATE COURT Record. (Polansky, Kevin) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/24/2023.] (Entered: 02/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING #3 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading. (de Oliveira, Flaviana) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/24/2023.] (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • Docket(#5) Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (de Oliveira, Flaviana) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/24/2023.] (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge George A. OToole, Jr assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/24/2023.] (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP.(Polansky, Kevin) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/24/2023.] (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP. (Polansky, Kevin) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/24/2023.] (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9698407 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Form)(Polansky, Kevin) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 2/24/2023.] (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less