This case was last updated from PACER on 04/12/2021 at 09:36:01 (UTC).

Lutcher Town v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 02/11/2021 Lutcher Town filed an Other lawsuit against AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jay C. Zainey, Donna Phillips Currault and Greg Gerard Guidry. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00300

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Donna Phillips Currault

Presiding Judges

Jay C. Zainey

Greg Gerard Guidry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Town of Lutcher

Defendants

Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.

McKesson Corporation

Mallinckrodt, LLC

Endo Health Solutions, Inc.

Anda, Inc.

Sandoz, Inc.

Actavis Kadian LLC

Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp.

Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.

Actavis Totowa LLC

Actavis Elizabeth LLC

Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

CVS Pharmacy Inc

Mallinckrodt, PLC

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

H.D. Smith, LLC

Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Allergan Sales, L.L.C.

Amneal Pharmaceutical, Inc.

44 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Leland G. Horton

Attorney at Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea, LLC (Shreveport)

401 Edwards Street, Suite 1000

Shreveport, LA 71101

Natalie J. Taylor

Attorney at Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea, LLC (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70163

Stacey Denise Williams

Attorney at Blanchard, Walker, O'Quin & Roberts, APLC

333 Texas Street, Suite 700

Shreveport, LA 71101

Madison Sharko

Attorney at Barrasso, Usdin, Kupperman, Freeman & Sarver, LLC

909 Poydras St., Suite 2350

New Orleans, LA 70112

Shannon Marie Kippers

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore LLC

450 Laurel Street, Suite 1150

Baton Rouge, LA 70801

Kelly Juneau Rookard

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Douglas J. Moore

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

James Alcee Brown

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 5000

New Orleans, LA 70139-5099

Thomas Mac Dougall Womack

Attorney at Taylor, Porter, Brooks & Phillips LLP

450 Laurel Street, 8Th Floor (70801), P. O. Box 2471

Baton Rouge, LA 70821-2471

Other Attorneys

S. Brian Perry

Attorney at Allen & Gooch, A Law Corporation (Lafayette)

2000 Kaliste Saloom Rd., Suite 400

Lafayette, LA 70508

Shelley K. Napolitano

Attorney at Maron Marvel Bradley Anderson & Tardy LLC (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 2411

New Orleans, LA 70170

John Francis Olinde

Attorney at Chaffe McCall LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., Suite 2300

New Orleans, LA 70163-2300

Karen M. Fontana

Attorney at Kean Miller LLP (New Orleans)

909 Poydras Street, Suite 3600

New Orleans, LA 70112

Kathryn Marie Knight

Attorney at Stone, Pigman, Walther, Wittmann, LLC (New Orleans)

909 Poydras Street, Suite 3150

New Orleans, LA 70112-4042

Walter John Leger, Jr.

Attorney at Leger & Shaw (New Orleans)

935 Gravier Street, Suite 2150

New Orleans, LA 70112

Glenn Michael Farnet

Attorney at Kean Miller, LLP (Baton Rouge)

400 Convention St., Suite 700, Po Box 3513 (70821-3513)

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

James Dalton Courson

Attorney at Stone, Pigman, Walther, Wittmann, LLC (New Orleans)

909 Poydras Street, Suite 3150

New Orleans, LA 70112-4042

Franklin J. Foil

Attorney at Franklin J. Foil, Attorney at Law

412 N Fourth Street, Suite 240

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Peter Joseph Rotolo, III

Attorney at Chaffe McCall LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., Suite 2300

New Orleans, LA 70163-2300

Franklin G. Shaw

Attorney at Leger & Shaw (New Orleans)

935 Gravier Street, Suite 2150

New Orleans, LA 70112

21 More Attorneys Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Receipt of Transfer Case to Northern District of Ohio (pp) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Order of MDL Transfer to Northern District of Ohio. MDL case number is 2804. Electronic file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (mm) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2804. (mm) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #10 Notice (Other). **Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Notice of Compliance. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Compliance re #1 Notice of Removal by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kippers, Shannon) Modified text/event on 3/1/2021 (mm). (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, as to McKesson Corporation answer due 5/25/2021. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 02/26/2021. (ko) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Susie Morgan recused. Case reassigned to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 2/24/2021. (NEF: Section T)(sbs) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Stacey) Modified text, added link on 2/24/2021 (sbs). (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Susie Morgan. Judge Jay C. Zainey no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey.(jrc) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Lutcher Town. Motion(s) will be submitted on 4/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Landry, Matthew) Modified txt on 2/23/2021 (ajn). (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (go) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by McKesson Corporation (Williams, Stacey) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by McKesson Corporation of Collateral Proceedings. (Williams, Stacey) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 23rd Judicial District Court, case number 40162 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8731899) filed by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit State Court Record)Attorney Stacey Denise Williams added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft).(Williams, Stacey) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where H.D. Smith, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Mylan Pharmaceuticals Incorporated is a litigant