This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/04/2021 at 09:11:55 (UTC).

Tower Realty Partners, Inc. v. Tower Commercial Real Estate, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/05/2021 Tower Realty Partners, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Tower Commercial Real Estate, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert N. Scola, Jr and Jonathan Goodman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-20902

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert N. Scola, Jr

Referral Judge

Jonathan Goodman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Tower Realty Partners, Inc. a Florida corporation

Tower Realty Partners, Inc.

Defendants

Tower Commercial Real Estate, LLC, a Florida limited liability company

Tower Commercial Real Estate, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ava K. Doppelt

Attorney at Allen Dyer Doppelt & Gilchrist

255 South Orange Avenue, Suite 1401

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant Attorney

Edward Maurice Mullins

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

1001 Brickell Bay Drive, Suite 900

Miami, FL 33131-2847

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Settlement by Tower Realty Partners, Inc. (Doppelt, Ava) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Tower Realty Partners, Inc.. Tower Commercial Real Estate, LLC served on 3/11/2021, answer due 4/1/2021. (Doppelt, Ava) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

#6

(#6) MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 3/8/2021. See attached document for full details. (fbn) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

#5

(#5) Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and Order Referring Discovery Matters to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 3/8/2021. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

#4

(#4) FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (pcs) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Tower Commercial Real Estate, LLC. (pcs) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

1 #2

Summon(s) to be issued

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief and Damages; Demand for Jury Trial against Tower Commercial Real Estate, LLC, a Florida limited liability company. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14499865, filed by Tower Realty Partners, Inc. a Florida corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) to be issued)(Doppelt, Ava) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Settlement by Tower Realty Partners, Inc. (Doppelt, Ava) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court grants #10 the Defendant's unopposed motion to respond to the complaint. The response is due by April 29, 2021. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (agn) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Tower Commercial Real Estate, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mullins, Edward) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court grants #8 the Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to the complaint. The response is due by April 15, 2021. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (agn) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint re #1 Complaint, by Tower Commercial Real Estate, LLC. Attorney Edward Maurice Mullins added to party Tower Commercial Real Estate, LLC(pty:dft). Responses due by 4/9/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mullins, Edward) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Tower Realty Partners, Inc.. Tower Commercial Real Estate, LLC served on 3/11/2021, answer due 4/1/2021. (Doppelt, Ava) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 3/8/2021. See attached document for full details. (fbn) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and Order Referring Discovery Matters to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 3/8/2021. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (pcs) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Tower Commercial Real Estate, LLC. (pcs) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief and Damages; Demand for Jury Trial against Tower Commercial Real Estate, LLC, a Florida limited liability company. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14499865, filed by Tower Realty Partners, Inc. a Florida corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) to be issued)(Doppelt, Ava) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edward M. Mullins