This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/01/2021 at 06:49:55 (UTC).

Tovey v. Trusted Media Brands, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/30/2019 Tovey filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Trusted Media Brands, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are William V. Gallo and Anthony J. Battaglia. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01643

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Referral Judge

William V. Gallo

Presiding Judge

Anthony J. Battaglia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dane Tovey

Defendants

Trusted Media Brands, Inc.

DOES 1-50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Zachariah Paul Dostart

Attorney at Dostart Hannink Coveney LLP

4180 La Jolla Village Drive, Suite 530

La Jolla, CA 92037

James T. Hannink

Attorney at Dostart Hannink & Coveney LLP

4180 La Jolla Village Drive, Suite 530

La Jolla, CA 92037

Defendant Attorneys

Kyle Thomas Cutts

Attorney at Key Tower, 127 Public Square

Suite 2000

Cleveland, OH 44114

Joseph S. Persoff

Attorney at Baker & Hosteler, LLP

11601 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90025

 

Court Documents

#25

#24

#23

#22

#21

#20

#19

4 #2

Proof of Service

4 #1

Declaration of Zach P. Dostart

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Dane Tovey Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Dostart, Zachariah) (jrm). (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) STATUS REPORT by Dane Tovey. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Dostart, Zachariah) (jrm). (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) STATUS REPORT by Dane Tovey. (Dostart, Zachariah) (jrm). (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) STATUS REPORT by Dane Tovey. (Dostart, Zachariah) (jrm). (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) STATUS REPORT by Dane Tovey. (Dostart, Zachariah) (jrm). (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) STATUS REPORT by Dane Tovey. (Dostart, Zachariah) (jrm). (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) STATUS REPORT by Dane Tovey. (Dostart, Zachariah)(jrm). (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) STATUS REPORT by Dane Tovey. (Dostart, Zachariah) (jrm). (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) STATUS REPORT by Dane Tovey. (Dostart, Zachariah) (jrm). (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) STATUS REPORT by Dane Tovey. (Dostart, Zachariah) (jrm). (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint. The deadline for TMB to move, plead or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended from 1/27/2020, to 2/27/2020.Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 1/17/2020. (jrm) Modified docket text; NEF regenerated on 1/21/2020 (jrm). (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Dane Tovey. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Zach P. Dostart in Support of Joint Motion to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint, #2 Proof of Service)(Dostart, Zachariah) (jrm). (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint (Doc. No #7 ). The deadline for Trusted Media Brands, Inc. to move, plead or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 1/27/2020. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 10/03/2019. (jrm) Modified docket text on 10/3/2019 (jrm). (jao). (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Response to the Complaint by Dane Tovey. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Zach P. Dostart, #2 Proof of Service)(Dostart, Zachariah) (jrm). (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph S. Persoff on behalf of Trusted Media Brands, Inc. (Persoff, Joseph)Attorney Joseph S. Persoff added to party Trusted Media Brands, Inc.(pty:dft) (jrm). (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint (Doc. No. #4 ). The deadline for TMB to move, plead or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 10/7/2019. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 9/6/2019. (Main Document 5 replaced on 9/6/2019) (jrm). Modified on 9/6/2019 (jrm) Modified docket text on 9/6/2019; NEF regenerated (jrm). (jao). (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Response to the Complaint by Dane Tovey. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Zach P. Dostart, #2 Proof of Service)(Dostart, Zachariah) (jrm). (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by James T. Hannink on behalf of Dane Tovey (Hannink, James)Attorney James T. Hannink added to party Dane Tovey(pty:pla) (jrm). (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Trusted Media Brands, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal. Identifying Other Affiliate RDA Holding Co. for Trusted Media Brands, Inc. (cdw) (jao). (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of the State of CA, County of SD, case number 37-02019-00038992-CU-BT-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12885901), filed by Trusted Media Brands, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01643-AJB-WVG. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case.(cdw)(jao). (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Trusted Media Brands Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Zachariah Paul Dostart

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James T Hannink