This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/26/2020 at 13:14:10 (UTC).

Touseull v. Community Advantage, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/27/2020 Touseull filed an Other - False Claims Act lawsuit against Community Advantage, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Lewis T. Babcock. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01511

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - False Claims Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lewis T. Babcock

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

roberta touseull

Defendant

Community Advantage, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Courtenay Leigh Patterson

Attorney at Courtenay Patterson, Law Offices of

1716 North Main Street, Suite A. #331

Longmont, CO 80501

Defendant Attorneys

Tommy Postek

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC-Denver

1900 16Th Street, Suite 800

Denver, CO 80202

Alan Leonard McLaughlin

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC-Denver

1900 16Th Street, Suite 800

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #9 . All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-01511-LTB. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, ) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Community Advantage, Inc. All parties do not consent.. (Postek, Tommy) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Community Advantage, Inc..(McLaughlin, Alan) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Tommy Postek on behalf of Community Advantage, Inc.Attorney Tommy Postek added to party Community Advantage, Inc.(pty:dft) (Postek, Tommy) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Community Advantage, Inc.. Community Advantage, Inc. waiver sent on 5/22/2020, answer due 7/21/2020. (McLaughlin, Alan) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Alan Leonard McLaughlin on behalf of Community Advantage, Inc.Attorney Alan Leonard McLaughlin added to party Community Advantage, Inc.(pty:dft) (McLaughlin, Alan) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Non-Consent Form. Consent Form due by 7/23/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 8/6/2020 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. By Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 05/29/2020. (rvill, ) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. NO SUMMONS ISSUED. (trvo, ) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (trvo, ) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Community Advantage, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7312806)Attorney Courtenay Leigh Patterson added to party roberta touseull(pty:pla), filed by roberta touseull. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Patterson, Courtenay) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alan L. McLaughlin