This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/08/2020 at 18:42:29 (UTC).

Touchet v. York Risk Services Group et al

Case Summary

On 04/09/2020 Touchet filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against York Risk Services Group. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are John W. deGravelles and Scott D. Johnson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00217

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John W. deGravelles

Referral Judge

Scott D. Johnson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Heather Touchet

Defendants

Fox Pest Control-Louisiana LLC

Carter Peterson

York Risk Services Group

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lewis Unglesby, Sr

Attorney at Unglesby Law Firm

246 Napoleon Street

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Jordan L Bollinger

Attorney at Unglesby Law Firm

246 Napoleon Street

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Yul D. Lorio

Attorney at Tauzin and Lorio

1228 Camelia Blvd. Suite A, Suite A

Lafayette, LA 70508

Defendant Attorneys

Trevor M. Cutaiar

Attorney at Mouledoux Brand Legrand and Brackett

701 Poydras Street, Suite 4250

New Orleans, LA 70139

Joseph Sebastian Trytten

Attorney at Mouledoux Bland Legrand Brackett

701 Poydras St, Ste. 4250

New Orleans, LA 70139

Andre' J. Mouledoux

Attorney at Mouledoux, Bland, Legrand & Brackett

Suite 4250 One Shell Square, 701 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70139-4250

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Verification Signed by Trevor M. Cutaiar

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit "A" - Original State Court Petition

1 #4

Exhibit "B" - Email Dated March 11,2020

#2

#3

#4

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STATUS REPORT by Heather Touchet. (Bollinger, Jordan) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Fox Pest Control-Louisiana LLC, Carter Peterson, York Risk Services Group.(Cutaiar, Trevor) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/18/2020 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. Status Report due by 6/4/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 4/14/2020. (KAH) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Letter to Attorney Lewis Unglesby, Sr. regarding Lance C. Beal and Matthew H. Hernandez who are Co-Counsel for party Heather Touchet. Attorneys are not admitted to practice in LAMD. (SWE) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court for the Parish of East Baton Rouge, Case Number C-692764. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2099420), filed by Carter Peterson, Fox Pest Control-Louisiana LLC, York Risk Services Group. (Attachments: #1 Verification Signed by Trevor M. Cutaiar, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit "A" - Original State Court Petition, #4 Exhibit "B" - Email Dated March 11,2020)(Cutaiar, Trevor) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where YORK RISK SERVICES GROUP, INC., a foreign corporat is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jordan L Bollinger

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lewis O. Unglesby