This case was last updated from PACER on 10/09/2020 at 09:23:04 (UTC).

TOTAL SYSTEMS SERVICES LLC et al v. GREEN

Case Summary

On 08/10/2020 TOTAL SYSTEMS SERVICES LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GREEN. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is CLAY D LAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00185

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CLAY D LAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TOTAL SYSTEMS SERVICES LLC

GLOBAL PAYMENTS INC

Petitioner

BLUESNAP INC

Defendant

JASON TODD GREEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nathan David Chapman

171 17Th Street Nw, Suite 1550

Atlanta, GA 30363

JOSEPH W OZMER, II

171 17Th St Nw, Ste 1550

Atlanta, GA 30363

Defendant and Petitioner Attorneys

TRISHA HARGROVE

P. O. Box 2848

Columbus, GA 31902

JERRY A BUCHANAN

Po Box 2848

Columbus, GA 31902

 

Court Documents

#40

(#40) STIPULATION by JASON TODD GREEN (BUCHANAN, JERRY) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

#39

(#39) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgment filed by JASON TODD GREEN. (BUCHANAN, JERRY) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

#38

RESTRICTED

#37

(#37) NOTICE Injunction Bond in the amount of $275,000 by GLOBAL PAYMENTS INC re #36 Order on Motion for TRO (Chapman, Nathan) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#36

(#36) ORDER granting #8 Motion for TRO and directing TSYS to give security in the amount of $275,000.00. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D. LAND on 8/31/2020 (tlf). (Entered: 08/31/2020)

35 #2

Exhibit S-2 excerpts from Hyde Deposition

35 #1

Exhibit S-1 excerpts from Kernodle Deposition

#35

(#35) RESPONSE filed by JASON TODD GREEN re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit S-1 excerpts from Kernodle Deposition, #2 Exhibit S-2 excerpts from Hyde Deposition)(BUCHANAN, JERRY) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

#34

(#34) Replaced by D.E. #35 . RESPONSE filed by JASON TODD GREEN re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit S-1, #2 Exhibit S-2)(BUCHANAN, JERRY) Modified on 8/31/2020 (tlf). (Entered: 08/31/2020)

1 #8

Summons

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

Notice of Deficiency; Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by TOTAL SYSTEMS SERVICES LLC; Exhibits were insufficiently identified. The CM/ECF procedures manual provides as follows: "A generic identifier such as Exhibit A or Exhibit 1 is not acceptable. The description must be of sufficient detail to make the attachment readily identifiable to the court. ". This was echoed by a user message during docketing of the event. No need to re-file. However, future deficiencies will require re-filing (tlf). (Entered: 08/10/2020)

94 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) STIPULATION by JASON TODD GREEN (BUCHANAN, JERRY) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgment filed by JASON TODD GREEN. (BUCHANAN, JERRY) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/28/2020, before Judge Clay D. Land. Court Reporter/Transcriber Betsy Peterson. Volume Number: I of I. The transcript may be inspected at the court or purchased through the court reporter for a period of 90 days. After 90 days, the transcript may be obtained via PACER. REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Complete redaction policy available on the courts website. (Peterson, Betsy) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) NOTICE Injunction Bond in the amount of $275,000 by GLOBAL PAYMENTS INC re #36 Order on Motion for TRO (Chapman, Nathan) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ORDER granting #8 Motion for TRO and directing TSYS to give security in the amount of $275,000.00. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D. LAND on 8/31/2020 (tlf). (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) RESPONSE filed by JASON TODD GREEN re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit S-1 excerpts from Kernodle Deposition, #2 Exhibit S-2 excerpts from Hyde Deposition)(BUCHANAN, JERRY) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency; Document must be re-filed; Related document: #34 Response to Motion filed by JASON TODD GREEN; Document must be re-filed to include a description of exhibits. The CM/ECF procedures manual provides as follows: "A generic identifier such as Exhibit A or Exhibit 1 is not acceptable. The description must be of sufficient detail to make the attachment readily identifiable to the court. " (tlf). (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Replaced by D.E. #35 . RESPONSE filed by JASON TODD GREEN re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit S-1, #2 Exhibit S-2)(BUCHANAN, JERRY) Modified on 8/31/2020 (tlf). (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency; No need to re-file; Related documents: #28 Exhibit(s) filed by JASON TODD GREEN, #30 Exhibit(s) filed by JASON TODD GREEN, #27 Exhibit(s) filed by JASON TODD GREEN, #29 Exhibit(s) filed by JASON TODD GREEN; Wrong event used; Filer should have filed a Certificate of Need to File Discovery and then filed the depositions as Civil Events, Other Filings, Discovery Documents, Deposition(tlf). (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE Reply by GLOBAL PAYMENTS INC re #26 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - September 6, 2019 Retention Letter, #2 Exhibit B - G2.com Webpage, #3 Exhibit C - Slintel.com Webpage, #4 Exhibit D - HackersPad.net Webpage, #5 Exhibit E - Datanyze.com Webpage)(Chapman, Nathan) (Entered: 08/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by GLOBAL PAYMENTS INC, TOTAL SYSTEMS SERVICES LLC filed by Nathan David Chapman. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Matthew Hyde, #3 Hyde Declaration Exhibit A - BlueSnap Press Release, #4 Hyde Declaration Exhibit B - BlueSnap Leadership Team Page, #5 Hyde Declaration Exhibit C - Jason Green LinkedIn Page, #6 Declaration of Kevin Edelen, #7 Edelen Declaration Exhibit A - 2018 Stock Grant, #8 Edelen Declaration Exhibit B - 2019 Stock Grant, #9 Edelen Declaration Exhibit C - 2020 Stock Grant, #10 Edelen Declaration Exhibit D - Separation Agreement, #11 Declaration of Nathan D. Chapman, #12 Chapman Declaration Exhibit A - Stockwell I Decision, #13 Chapman Declaration Exhibit B - Stockwell II Decision, #14 Chapman Declaration Exhibit C - Comparative Chart, #15 Chapman Declaration Exhibit D - Letter to Green, #16 Proposed Order)(Chapman, Nathan) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by GLOBAL PAYMENTS INC identifying Other Affiliate CAYAN LLC, Other Affiliate COMERICA GLOBAL PAYMENTS ENTIDAD DE PAGO S.L., Other Affiliate GLOBAL PAYMENTS DIRECT INC., Other Affiliate GLOBAL PAYMENTS GAMING SERVICES INC., Other Affiliate GPUK LLP, Other Affiliate HEARTLAND PAYMENT SYSTEMS LLC, Other Affiliate NETSPEND CORPORATION, Other Affiliate TSYS LLC, Other Affiliate TSYS MERCHANT SOLUTIONS INC. for GLOBAL PAYMENTS INC. (Chapman, Nathan) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Jurisdictional Statement by GLOBAL PAYMENTS INC (Chapman, Nathan) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Jurisdictional Statement by TOTAL SYSTEMS SERVICES LLC (Chapman, Nathan) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by TOTAL SYSTEMS SERVICES LLC identifying Corporate Parent GLOBAL PAYMENTS INC for TOTAL SYSTEMS SERVICES LLC. (Chapman, Nathan) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Replaced by D.E. #4 . Corporate Disclosure Statement by TOTAL SYSTEMS SERVICES LLC identifying Corporate Parent GLOBAL PAYMENTS INC for TOTAL SYSTEMS SERVICES LLC. (Chapman, Nathan) Modified on 8/11/2020 (tlf). (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons issued to JASON TODD GREEN (tlf). (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency; Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by TOTAL SYSTEMS SERVICES LLC; Exhibits were insufficiently identified. The CM/ECF procedures manual provides as follows: "A generic identifier such as Exhibit A or Exhibit 1 is not acceptable. The description must be of sufficient detail to make the attachment readily identifiable to the court. ". This was echoed by a user message during docketing of the event. No need to re-file. However, future deficiencies will require re-filing (tlf). (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency; Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by TOTAL SYSTEMS SERVICES INC; Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. No need to re-file (tlf). (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Jason Todd Green Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3535235, $400 filed by Total Systems Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons)(Chapman, Nathan) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Total System Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Global Payments Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JERRY A BUCHANAN