Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/20/2020 at 08:10:55 (UTC).

TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS & REFINING USA, INC. v. BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 02/20/2020 TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS REFINING USA, INC filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Beryl A. Howell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00483

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Beryl A. Howell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS & REFINING USA, INC.

Defendants

UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY

NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY

BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY

CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.

Interested Party

NORFOLK SOUTHERN CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Geoffrey L. Harrison

Attorney at SUSMAN GODFREY LLP

1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002

Shawn L. Raymond

Attorney at SUSMAN GODFREY LLP

1000 Louisiana St., Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorneys

Noelle M. Reed

Attorney at SKADDEN, ARPS, SLATE, MEAGHER & FLOM LLP

1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 6800

Houston, TX 77002

Glenn D. Pomerantz

Attorney at MUNGER TOLLS & OLSON, LLP

350 South Grand Avenue, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Luke P. van Houwelingen

Attorney at CROWELL & MORING LLP

1001 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W., 1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004-2595

Martin J. Mackowski

Attorney at CROWELL & MORING LLP

1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Kent Alan Gardiner

Attorney at CROWELL & MORING LLP

1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

 

Court Documents

#29

(#29) PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 25, 2020. (lcbah3) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

28 #2

Text of Proposed Order

28 #1

Exhibit 1 - Proposed Protective Order

#28

(#28) MOTION for Protective Order by TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS & REFINING USA, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Protective Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Harrison, Geoffrey) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

27 #1

Exhibit 1 - Proposed Stipulated Protective Order

#27

(#27) NOTICE of Stipulated Protective Order by TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS & REFINING USA, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Stipulated Protective Order)(Harrison, Geoffrey) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

#26

(#26) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY (Pomerantz, Glenn) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

#25

(#25) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY.(Pomerantz, Glenn) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

5 #3

Summon

5 #1

Summon

4 #1

Appendix A

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Related Cases by Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Harrison, Geoffrey) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/20/2020.] (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc. identifying TOTAL S.A. of France as Corporate Parent, filed.(Harrison, Geoffrey) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/20/2020.] (Entered: 12/26/2019)

2 #3

Request for Issuance of Summons

2 #2

Request for Issuance of Summons

2 #1

Request for Issuance of Summons

#2

(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Request for Issuance of Summons, #2 Request for Issuance of Summons, #3 Request for Issuance of Summons)(Harrison, Geoffrey) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/20/2020.] (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#1

(#24) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC..(van Houwelingen, Luke) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 25, 2020. (lcbah3) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING #28 Motion for Approval and Entry of Protective Order. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 25, 2020. (lcbah3) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MOTION for Protective Order by TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS & REFINING USA, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Protective Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Harrison, Geoffrey) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE of Stipulated Protective Order by TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS & REFINING USA, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Stipulated Protective Order)(Harrison, Geoffrey) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY (Pomerantz, Glenn) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY.(Pomerantz, Glenn) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC..(van Houwelingen, Luke) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. (van Houwelingen, Luke) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Appearance by Martin J. Mackowski on behalf of CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. (Mackowski, Martin) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Kent Alan Gardiner on behalf of CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. (Gardiner, Kent) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to BNSF Railway Company served on 12/31/2019, answer due 3/2/2020, filed.(Raymond, Shawn) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/20/2020.] (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc. identifying TOTAL S.A. of France as Corporate Parent, filed.(Harrison, Geoffrey) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/20/2020.] (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Erica Harris on behalf of Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc., filed. (Harris, Erica) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/20/2020.] (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Shawn L. Raymond on behalf of Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc., filed. (Raymond, Shawn) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/20/2020.] (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Telephone and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Counsel who filed or removed the action is responsible for placing the conference call and insuring that all parties are on the line. The call shall be placed to (713)250-5613. Telephone Conference set for 5/4/2020 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt (Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoyadi, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/20/2020.] (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summon, #2 Summon, #3 Summon)(hlerma, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/20/2020.] (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Related Cases by Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Harrison, Geoffrey) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/20/2020.] (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc. identifying TOTAL S.A. of France as Corporate Parent, filed.(Harrison, Geoffrey) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/20/2020.] (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Request for Issuance of Summons, #2 Request for Issuance of Summons, #3 Request for Issuance of Summons)(Harrison, Geoffrey) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/20/2020.] (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23839452) filed by Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Harrison, Geoffrey) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/20/2020.] (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Union Pacific Railroad Company is a litigant

Latest cases where CSX Transportation Inc is a litigant