This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/13/2021 at 08:35:32 (UTC).

TOT Power Control, S.L. v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 09/14/2021 TOT Power Control, S L filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Samsung Electronics Co , Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Maryellen Noreika. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01305

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maryellen Noreika

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TOT Power Control, S.L.

Defendants

Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.

Samsung Electronics America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian E. Farnan

Attorney at Farnan LLP

919 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Michael J. Farnan

Attorney at Farnan LLP

919 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by TOT Power Control, S.L.. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. served on 9/15/2021, answer due 10/6/2021. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

#6

(#6) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint - filed by TOT Power Control, S.L. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Farnan, Michael) Modified on 10/1/2021 (mdb). (Entered: 10/01/2021)

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint [UNOPPOSED] filed by TOT Power Control, S.L., Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Samsung Electronics America, Inc. answer due 12/14/2021; Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. answer due 12/14/2021.. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/1/2021. (mdb) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint - filed by TOT Power Control, S.L. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Farnan, Michael) Modified on 10/1/2021 (mdb). (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01304-MN, 1:21-cv-01305-MN (rjb) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by TOT Power Control, S.L.. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. served on 9/15/2021, answer due 10/6/2021. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc. on 9/14/2021. (smg) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 7,532,865 B2 ;US 7,496,376 B2. (smg) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (smg) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3698540.) - filed by TOT Power Control, S.L. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(smg) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TOT Power Control, S.L. is a litigant

Latest cases where Samsung Electronics America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian E. Farnan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael J. Farnan