TOT Power Control, S.L. v. AT&T, Inc. et al

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by TOT Power Control, S.L.. (Robinson, Erick) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14437766). No Summons requested at this time, filed by TOT Power Control, S.L.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Robinson, Erick) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Pursuant to the Standing Order Regarding Patent/Trademark Cases effective 12/9/19, Attorneys filing Patent/Trademark cases in TXWD Waco division must prepare the attached form AO120, FLATTEN, and e-file using the "Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form" event upon opening of the case. (Attachments: #1 AO-120) (lad) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Robinson, Erick) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to AT&T, Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to AT&T Corporation. (lad) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to AT&T Mobility LLC. (lad) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by TOT Power Control, S.L.. AT&T Corporation served on 2/4/2021, answer due 2/25/2021. (Robinson, Erick) (Entered: 02/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by TOT Power Control, S.L.. AT&T, Inc. served on 2/4/2021, answer due 2/25/2021. (Robinson, Erick) (Entered: 02/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by TOT Power Control, S.L.. AT&T Mobility LLC served on 2/4/2021, answer due 2/25/2021. (Robinson, Erick) (Entered: 02/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Standing Order Regarding Filing Documents Under Seal and Redacted Pleadings in Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. as of 2/12/2021. (bot1) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark D. Siegmund on behalf of AT&T Corporation, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T, Inc.. Attorney Mark D. Siegmund added to party AT&T Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Mark D. Siegmund added to party AT&T Mobility LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Mark D. Siegmund added to party AT&T, Inc.(pty:dft) (Siegmund, Mark) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint by AT&T Corporation, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Siegmund, Mark) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. It is hereby ORDERED that the deadline for Defendant to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to April 12, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (re) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketReset Deadlines: AT&T Corporation answer due 4/12/2021; AT&T Mobility LLC answer due 4/12/2021; AT&T, Inc. answer due 4/12/2021. (bw) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gilbert Andrew Greene on behalf of AT&T Corporation, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T, Inc.. Attorney Gilbert Andrew Greene added to party AT&T Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Gilbert Andrew Greene added to party AT&T Mobility LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Gilbert Andrew Greene added to party AT&T, Inc.(pty:dft) (Greene, Gilbert) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gilbert Andrew Greene on behalf of Matthew S. Yungwirth ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14669593) by on behalf of AT&T Corporation, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Greene, Gilbert) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by TOT Power Control, S.L. (Robinson, Erick) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Correction: Case was closed in error following the filing of #17 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. It has been re-opened, leaving AT&T Mobility as the only active Defendant. Notice will be sent to Patent/Trademark office to this effect. (lad) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bot1) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gilbert Andrew Greene on behalf of John R. Gibson ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14685724) by on behalf of AT&T Corporation, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Greene, Gilbert) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gilbert Andrew Greene on behalf of L. Norwood Jameson ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14685973) by on behalf of AT&T Corporation, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Greene, Gilbert) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against TOT Power Control, S.L. by AT&T Mobility LLC.(Siegmund, Mark) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Siegmund, Mark) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bot1) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) STATUS REPORT (Case Status Readiness Report) by TOT Power Control, S.L.. (Robinson, Erick) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Matthew S. Yungwirth for AT&T Mobility LLC. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John R. Gibson for AT&T Mobility LLC. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney L. Norwood Jameson for AT&T Mobility LLC. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ANSWER to #21 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim (Plaintiff's Answer to AT&T Counterclaims) by TOT Power Control, S.L..(Robinson, Erick) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MOTION For Leave to Intervene by Ericsson Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - ETOT Ericsson's Intervenor Answer (AT&T), #2 Proposed Order)(Greene, Gilbert) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gilbert Andrew Greene on behalf of David C. Dotson ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14788997) by on behalf of Ericsson Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Greene, Gilbert) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #26 MOTION For Leave to Intervene by TOT Power Control, S.L.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Robinson, Erick) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David C. Dotson for Ericsson Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ir) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #26 MOTION For Leave to Intervene by TOT Power Control, S.L.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Robinson, Erick) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #26 MOTION For Leave to Intervene by TOT Power Control, S.L.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Robinson, Erick) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #26 MOTION For Leave to Intervene by TOT Power Control, S.L.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Robinson, Erick) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott L. Cole on behalf of Nokia of America Corp.. Attorney Scott L. Cole added to party Nokia of America Corp.(pty:mov) (Cole, Scott) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David A. Nelson on behalf of Nokia of America Corp.. Attorney David A. Nelson added to party Nokia of America Corp.(pty:mov) (Nelson, David) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Scott L. Cole on behalf of Brianne M. Straka ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14890373) by on behalf of Nokia of America Corp.. (Cole, Scott) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) MOTION For Leave to Intervene by Nokia of America Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Nokia's Answer in Intervention, #2 Proposed Order)(Cole, Scott) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #28 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Alan D Albright. It is ORDERED that the deadline for Plaintiff to respond to Motion for Leave to Intervene is extended to and through May 28, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (re) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #31 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Alan D Albright. It is ORDERED that the deadline for Plaintiff to respond to Motion for Leave to Intervene is extended to and through June 11, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (re) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order MOOTING #29 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (re) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order MOOTING #30 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (re) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #34 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (re) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by TOT Power Control, S.L., re #26 MOTION For Leave to Intervene filed by Movant Ericsson Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1-Robinson Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Robinson, Erick) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Erick Scott Robinson for John F. Petrsoric ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14910577) by on behalf of TOT Power Control, S.L.. (Robinson, Erick) (Main Document 37 replaced on 6/15/2021) (lad). (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Erick Scott Robinson for Mark S. Raskin ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14910641) by on behalf of TOT Power Control, S.L.. (Robinson, Erick) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #35 MOTION For Leave to Intervene by TOT Power Control, S.L.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Robinson, Erick) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) Standing Order regarding Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Ericsson Inc., re #26 MOTION For Leave to Intervene filed by Movant Ericsson Inc. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Document Declaration of John R. Gibson, #2 Sealed Document Exhibit A, #3 Sealed Document Exhibit B, #4 Sealed Document Exhibit C, #5 Sealed Document Exhibit D, #6 Sealed Document Exhibit E, #7 Sealed Document Exhibit F, #8 Sealed Document Exhibit G)(Greene, Gilbert) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) NOTICE of Filing Documents Under Seal by Ericsson Inc. re #41 Reply to Response to Motion, (Greene, Gilbert) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #35 MOTION For Leave to Intervene by TOT Power Control, S.L.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Robinson, Erick) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #35 MOTION For Leave to Intervene by TOT Power Control, S.L.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Robinson, Erick) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) NOTICE of IPR Petition Filing by Ericsson by TOT Power Control, S.L. (Robinson, Erick) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #35 MOTION For Leave to Intervene by TOT Power Control, S.L.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Robinson, Erick) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #35 MOTION For Leave to Intervene by TOT Power Control, S.L.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Robinson, Erick) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #37 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (re) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #38 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (re) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) Proposed Scheduling Order (Joint Motion for Entry of Pre-Markman Scheduling Order) by TOT Power Control, S.L.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Robinson, Erick) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #35 MOTION For Leave to Intervene by TOT Power Control, S.L.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Robinson, Erick) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Scott L. Cole on behalf of Marc L. Kaplan ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15033436) by on behalf of Nokia of America Corp.. (Cole, Scott) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Scott L. Cole on behalf of John Poulos ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15033453) by on behalf of Nokia of America Corp.. (Cole, Scott) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Scott L. Cole on behalf of Samantha Cutler ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15033547) by on behalf of Nokia of America Corp.. (Cole, Scott) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO NOKIA OF AMERICA CORPORATIONS MOTION TO INTERVENE by TOT Power Control, S.L. re #35 MOTION For Leave to Intervene (Robinson, Erick) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #50 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Marc L. Kaplan for Nokia of America Corp. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jc5) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order MOOTING #39 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; MOOTING #43 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; MOOTING #44 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; MOOTING #46 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; MOOTING #47 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; MOOTING #49 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (re) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #51 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright; GRANTING #52 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (re) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) ORDER GRANTING #35 Motion FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (ir) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) Answer in Intervention and Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Nokia of America Corp..(Nelson, David) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gilbert Andrew Greene on behalf of Joseph A. Powers ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15075625) by on behalf of AT&T Corporation, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Greene, Gilbert) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #56 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joseph Powers. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jc5) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) NOTICE of Compliance Regarding Preliminary Invalidity Contentions by Nokia of America Corp. (Straka, Brianne) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) AGREED PRE-MARKMAN SCHEDULING ORDER: Markman Hearing set for 1/11/2022 09:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jc5) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING ERICSSONS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE [ECF No. 26]. Ericsson is ORDERED to file its Answer in Intervention within seven (7) days of the issuance of this Order. In view of this order, the Court will consider any motion to amend the scheduling order to grant Ericsson time to prepare its Markman briefing. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jc5) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Nokia of America Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Nokia Corporation, Other Affiliate Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy, Other Affiliate Nokia Solutions and Networks B.V. for Nokia of America Corp.. (Cole, Scott) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) Answer in Intervention and Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against TOT Power Control, S.L. by Ericsson Inc..(Greene, Gilbert) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Ericsson Inc.. (Greene, Gilbert) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) NOTICE of Change of Address by Mark D. Siegmund (Siegmund, Mark) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) Opening Claim Construction Brief by AT&T Mobility LLC, Ericsson Inc., Nokia of America Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Greene, Gilbert) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gilbert Andrew Greene on behalf of Ericsson Inc. (Greene, Gilbert) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John R. Gibson on behalf of Ericsson Inc. (Gibson, John) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) ANSWER to #62 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by TOT Power Control, S.L..(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) Reply Claim Construction Brief regarding #65 Claim Construction Brief by TOT Power Control, S.L.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Dr. Robert Akl)(Petrsoric, John) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) ORDER APPOINTING TECHNICAL ADVISOR. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) Reply Claim Construction Brief by AT&T Corporation, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T, Inc.. (Greene, Gilbert) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) Reply Claim Construction Brief by TOT Power Control, S.L.. (Petrsoric, John) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) Joint Claim Construction Brief or Statement by TOT Power Control, S.L.. (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) Joint MOTION to Stay Case by TOT Power Control, S.L.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Petrsoric, John) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) ORDER, (Markman Hearing set for 1/24/2022 03:00 PM before Judge Alan D Albright). Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot3) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) ORDER GRANTING #74 JOINT MOTION TO STAY. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (ir) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deron R Dacus on behalf of Nokia of America Corp.. Attorney Deron R Dacus added to party Nokia of America Corp.(pty:mov) (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) Joint MOTION to Stay Case by TOT Power Control, S.L.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Petrsoric, John) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) ORDER GRANTING #78 Motion to Stay Case - for fourteen (14) days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jc5) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#80) Joint MOTION to Stay Case by TOT Power Control, S.L.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Petrsoric, John) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#81) ORDER GRANTING #80 Motion to Stay Case - for seven (7) days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jc5) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketParties shall comply with Judge Albright's updated #standing orders and # COVID-19 standing order available by clicking the included hyperlinks. The updated orders are as follows:1. #Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness for Patent Cases 030722,2. #Standing Order on Pretrial Procedures and Requirements in Civil Cases 030722,3. #Standing Order Governing Proceedings 4.0 - Patent Cases 030722,4. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Coronavirus (COVID-19) and Court Proceedings,5. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Joint Or Unopposed Request To Change Deadlines 030722,6. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Filing Documents Under Seal and Redacted Public Versions 030722. (jkda) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less