This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/13/2021 at 08:34:51 (UTC).

TOT Power Control, S.L. v. Apple, Inc.

Case Summary

On September 14, 2021, TOT Power Control, S.L. (“TOT” or “Plaintiff”), represented by Brian E. Farnan and Michael J. Farnan of Farnan LLP, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Apple, Inc. (“Apple” or “Defendant”), seeking permanent injunctive relief and damages along with post-judgement interest among other relief for the alleged infringement of the United States Patents owned by the plaintiff. This case was filed in the United States District Court in the District of Delaware.

The plaintiff filed this complaint for the alleged infringement of the United States Patent No. 7,532,865 (the ’865 patent), entitled “Outer Loop Power Control Method and Device for Wireless Communications Systems” and United States Patent No. 7,496,376 (the ’376 patent), entitled “Outer Loop Power Control Method and Apparatus for Wireless Communications Systems” (collectively, “TOT Patents” or “Patents-in-suit”) owned by the plaintiff. 

In the complaint, the plaintiff alleged that, “On information and belief and pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 271(a), Apple has directly infringed and continues to infringe one or more claims of the ’865 patent, including but not limited to Claims 1 and 5, pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 271(a), literally or under the doctrine of equivalents.”

The plaintiff also alleged that, “Apple has directly infringed, and continues to infringe, one or more claims of the ’865 patent by among other things, making, using, selling, offering to sell, and/or importing into the United States without authorization certain mobile products (e.g., iPhones, iPads, and Apple Watches) that contain components which practice the invention claimed in the ‘865 patent (the “Apple Accused Products”).”

Further, the plaintiff alleged that, “Apple’s infringement of the ‘865 patent has been knowing, deliberate and willful. TOT disclosed the invention claimed by the ‘865 patent to both Intel and Qualcomm at different times between 2005 and 2014, and the invention has been so well publicized in the industry generally that Apple knew that the wireless transceivers it incorporated into the Apple Accused Products infringed the TOT Patents or should have known that its use of the wireless baseband processors constituted an unjustifiably high risk of infringement.”

Similar allegations have been made by the plaintiff with reference to the infringement of other Patents-in-suit. 

There are two claims for relief laid down by the plaintiff, one for the infringement of each of the Patents-in-suit.

In the prayer for relief, the plaintiff has requested the court for permanent injunctive relief and declaratory relief. The plaintiff also requested the court for an award for damages arising out of Apple’s infringement of the Patents-in-suit, including supplemental damages for any continuing post-verdict infringement up until entry of the final judgment, with an accounting, as needed, and enhanced damages pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 284, together with prejudgment and post-judgment interest. The plaintiff also requested the court for treble damages and damages for post-verdict infringement along with an award for an ongoing royalty and costs and any other relief the court deems just and proper.

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01302

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maryellen Noreika

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TOT Power Control, S.L.

Defendant

Apple, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian E. Farnan

Attorney at Farnan LLP

919 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Michael J. Farnan

Attorney at Farnan LLP

919 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Defendant Attorney

Brian A. Biggs

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP

1201 N. Market Street, Suite 2100

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by TOT Power Control, S.L.. Apple, Inc. served on 9/15/2021, answer due 10/6/2021. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to November 5, 2021 - filed by Apple, Inc.. (Biggs, Brian) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer complaint to January 4, 2022 - filed by Apple, Inc.. (Biggs, Brian) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint to January 4, 2022 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Apple, Inc. answer due 1/4/2022). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/5/2021. (dlw) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer complaint to January 4, 2022 - filed by Apple, Inc.. (Biggs, Brian) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to November 5, 2021 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Apple, Inc. answer due 11/5/2021). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/5/2021. (dlw) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to November 5, 2021 - filed by Apple, Inc.. (Biggs, Brian) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by TOT Power Control, S.L.. Apple, Inc. served on 9/15/2021, answer due 10/6/2021. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Apple, Inc. on 9/14/2021. (twk) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 7,532,865 B2; US 7,496,376 B2. (twk) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Apple, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3698349.) - filed by TOT Power Control, S.L.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(twk) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TOT Power Control, S.L. is a litigant

Latest cases where Apple Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian A. Biggs