This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/11/2023 at 10:07:14 (UTC).

TOSCANO v. COLEY et al

Case Summary

On 12/13/2022 TOSCANO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against COLEY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are William J. Martini and Edward S. Kiel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-07246

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William J. Martini

Referral Judge

Edward S. Kiel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MICHELLE M. TOSCANO

Defendants

GREGORY E. COLEY

AMERICAS SERVICE LINE, LLC

ROSEN'S DIVERSIFIED

JOHN DOES 1-10 (fictitious names)

ABC COMPANIES, INC. 1-10 (fictitious names)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KARIM ARZADI

Defendant Attorney

JEFFREY ALAN PAYNE

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AMERICAS SERVICE LINE, LLC, GREGORY E. COLEY from Superior Court, Middlesex, case number MID-L-002123-22. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13892429), filed by AMERICAS SERVICE LINE, LLC, GREGORY E. COLEY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Answer, #3 Exhibit C - Stipulation, #4 Exhibit D - Response to Damages)(PAYNE, JEFFREY) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit B - Answer

1 #3

Exhibit C - Stipulation

1 #4

Exhibit D - Response to Damages

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAS SERVICE LINE, LLC identifying American Food Groups, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (PAYNE, JEFFREY) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by AMERICAS SERVICE LINE, LLC, GREGORY E. COLEY re #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty), #1 Notice of Removal, CIVIL COVER SHEET (PAYNE, JEFFREY) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

#4

(#4) LETTER ORDER: A telephonic initial scheduling conference shall be held on January 30, 2023 at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The dial in number is 1-888-684-8852 and the access code is 310-0383#. The parties shall file a proposed joint discovery plan no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Court's form joint discovery plan can be found # here. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 12/22/2022. (sms) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

#5

(#5) Diversity Disclosure Statement by MICHELLE M. TOSCANO. (ARZADI, KARIM) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

#6

(#6) Joint Discovery Plan by MICHELLE M. TOSCANO.(ARZADI, KARIM) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

#7

(#7) ORDER that a telephone status conference is scheduled for 5/22/2023 at 10:45 a.m. Fact discovery is to remain open through 5/31/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 2/8/2023. (qa, ) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

 

Docket Entries

02/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) ORDER that a telephone status conference is scheduled for 5/22/2023 at 10:45 a.m. Fact discovery is to remain open through 5/31/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 2/8/2023. (qa, ) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/30/2023

DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel: R16 Scheduling Conference held on 1/30/2023. (sms) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Joint Discovery Plan by MICHELLE M. TOSCANO.(ARZADI, KARIM) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #5 Joint Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Karim Arzadi on 1/25/2023 was submitted incorrectly as a Diversity Disclosure Statement. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN USING the event "Joint Discovery Plan" found under Civil-Other Filings-Discovery Documents. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (qa, ) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Diversity Disclosure Statement by MICHELLE M. TOSCANO. (ARZADI, KARIM) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) LETTER ORDER: A telephonic initial scheduling conference shall be held on January 30, 2023 at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The dial in number is 1-888-684-8852 and the access code is 310-0383#. The parties shall file a proposed joint discovery plan no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Court's form joint discovery plan can be found # here. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 12/22/2022. (sms) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/14/2022

DocketCASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jr) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/14/2022

DocketCase assigned to Judge William J. Martini and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. (jr) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/14/2022

DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information - Do not add attorney and address for the party's address. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jr) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/13/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE by AMERICAS SERVICE LINE, LLC, GREGORY E. COLEY re #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty), #1 Notice of Removal, CIVIL COVER SHEET (PAYNE, JEFFREY) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/13/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAS SERVICE LINE, LLC identifying American Food Groups, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (PAYNE, JEFFREY) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/13/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AMERICAS SERVICE LINE, LLC, GREGORY E. COLEY from Superior Court, Middlesex, case number MID-L-002123-22. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13892429), filed by AMERICAS SERVICE LINE, LLC, GREGORY E. COLEY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Answer, #3 Exhibit C - Stipulation, #4 Exhibit D - Response to Damages)(PAYNE, JEFFREY) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less