This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 07:47:24 (UTC).

Tosca Services LLC v. Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Tosca Services LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael R. Barrett. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01027

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael R. Barrett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tosca Services LLC

Defendant

Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brian P Muething

Attorney at Keating Muething & Klekamp

1 Est 4Th Street, Suite 1400

Cincinnati, OH 45202

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Tosca Services LLC (Muething, Brian) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Tosca Services LLC against Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7227702), filed by Tosca Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Muething, Brian) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE by Plaintiff Tosca Services LLC Civil Cover Sheet (Muething, Brian) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#3

(#3) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Show Cause Response due 14 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 12/5/19. (ba) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to #4 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (ba) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Tosca Services LLC (Muething, Brian) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Show Cause Response due 14 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 12/5/19. (ba) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by Plaintiff Tosca Services LLC Civil Cover Sheet (Muething, Brian) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketIf this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (bjc) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Tosca Services LLC against Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7227702), filed by Tosca Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Muething, Brian) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.