This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/01/2022 at 08:41:12 (UTC).

Torus Ventures LLC v. Super Micro Computer, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/03/2021 Torus Ventures LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Super Micro Computer, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Maryellen Noreika. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01711

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maryellen Noreika

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Torus Ventures LLC

Defendant

Super Micro Computer, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David W. deBruin

Attorney at Gawthrop Greenwood, PC

3711 Kennett Pike, Suite 100

Wilmington, DE 19807

Howard L. Wernow

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Super Micro Computer, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3755610.) - filed by Torus Ventures LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(twk) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,203,844. (twk) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Torus Ventures LLC. (twk) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Super Micro Computer, Inc. on 12/3/2021. (twk) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Torus Ventures LLC. Super Micro Computer, Inc. served on 12/8/2021, answer due 12/29/2021. (deBruin, David) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Howard L. Wernow - filed by Torus Ventures LLC. (deBruin, David) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Torus Ventures LLC: For Super Micro Computer, Inc. waiver sent on 12/29/2021, answer due 3/29/2022. (deBruin, David) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Howard L. Wernow for Torus Ventures LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (srs) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Torus Ventures LLC: For Super Micro Computer, Inc. waiver sent on 12/29/2021, answer due 3/29/2022. (deBruin, David) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Howard L. Wernow filed by Torus Ventures LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/3/2022. (dlw) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Howard L. Wernow - filed by Torus Ventures LLC. (deBruin, David) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Torus Ventures LLC. Super Micro Computer, Inc. served on 12/8/2021, answer due 12/29/2021. (deBruin, David) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Super Micro Computer, Inc. on 12/3/2021. (twk) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Torus Ventures LLC. (twk) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,203,844. (twk) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Super Micro Computer, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3755610.) - filed by Torus Ventures LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(twk) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Super Micro Computer, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David W. deBruin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Howard L. Wernow