This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/15/2021 at 08:52:42 (UTC).

Torus Ventures LLC v. Panasonic Corporation of North America

Case Summary

On August 16, 2021, Torus Ventures LLC (“Plaintiff”), represented by Howard L. Wernow of Sand, Sebolt & Wernow Co., LPA, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Panasonic Corporation of North America (“Defendant”), seeking an award of damages along with pre- or post-judgement interest and disbursement for the alleged infringement of patent related to “Method and system for a recursive security protocol for digital copyright control” (’844 Patent) owned by Plaintiff. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court in the Western District of Texas with Judge Alan D. Albright presiding.

 

The plaintiff filed this complaint for the alleged infringement of U.S. Patent No. 7,203,844 entitled “Method and system for a recursive security protocol for digital copyright control” (the ’844 Patent or the “Patent-in-Suit”) owned by them.

 

In the complaint, the plaintiff alleged that, “Defendant has been and continues to directly infringe one or more claims of the ’844 Patent in at least this District by making, using, offering to sell, selling and/or importing, without limitation, at least the Defendant products identified in the charts incorporated into this Count below (among the “Exemplary Defendant Products”) that infringe at least the exemplary claims of the ’844 Patent also identified in the charts incorporated into this Count below (the “Exemplary ’844 Patent Claims”) literally or by the doctrine of equivalents. On information and belief, numerous other devices that infringe the claims of the ’844 Patent have been made, used, sold, imported, and offered for sale by Defendant and/or its customers.”

 

The plaintiff further alleged that, “Defendant also has and continues to directly infringe, literally or under the doctrine of equivalents, the Exemplary ’844 Patent Claims, by having its employees internally test and use these Exemplary Products. Despite actual knowledge, Defendant continues to make, use, test, sell, offer for sale, market, and/or import into the United States, products that infringe the ’844 Patent.”

 

The plaintiff also alleged that, “At least since being served by this Complaint and corresponding claim charts, Defendant has actively, knowingly, and intentionally continued to induce infringement of the ’844 Patent, literally or by the doctrine of equivalents, by selling Exemplary Defendant Products to their customers for use in end-user products in a manner that infringes one or more claims of the ’844 Patent.”

 

There is only one claim for relief laid down by the plaintiff which deals with the infringement of the ’844 Patent.

 

In its prayer for relief the plaintiff requested the Court for a judgment that the ’844 Patent is valid and enforceable and that Defendant has infringed directly and indirectly one or more claims of the ’844 Patent; A judgment that awards Plaintiff all appropriate damages under 35 U.S.C. § 284 for Defendant's continuing or future infringement, up until the date such judgment is entered with respect to the ’844 Patent, including pre- or post-judgment interest, costs, and disbursements as justified under 35 U.S.C. § 284 and, if necessary, to adequately compensate Plaintiff for Defendant's infringement, an accounting that this case be declared exceptional and that Plaintiff be awarded costs of litigation.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00853

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Torus Ventures LLC

Defendant

Panasonic Corporation of North America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Howard L. Wernow

Attorney at Sand, Sebolt & Wernow Co., LPA

Aegis Tower - Suite 1100, 4940 Munson Street Nw

Canton, OH 44718

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit 1-US7203844

1 #2

Exhibit 2-Claim Chart

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Panasonic Corporation of North America. (ir) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (ir) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall flatten all documents before e-filing. All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/ (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Wernow, Howard) (Main Document 4 replaced on 8/16/2021) (ir). (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Torus Ventures LLC. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Torus Ventures LLC. (Wernow, Howard) (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/16/2021) (ir). (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15122893), filed by Torus Ventures LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-US7203844, #2 Exhibit 2-Claim Chart, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wernow, Howard) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/16/2021) (ir). (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Panasonic Corporation of North America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Howard L. Wernow