1:22-CV-01258
09/23/2022
Pending - Other Pending
Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy
Richard G. Andrews
Tort Claimants
Boy Scouts of America and Delaware BSA, LLC
Boy Scouts of America
Delaware BSA, LLC
Tort Claimants' Committee
Coalition of Abused Scouts for Justice
Future Claimants' Representative
The Zalkin Law Firm, P.C.
Pfau Cochran Vertetis Amala PLLC
Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company
First State Insurance Company
Twin City Fire Insurance Company
Navigators Specialty Insurance Company
American Zurich Insurance Company
American Guarantee Insurance Company
Steadfast Insurance Company
Clarendon National Insurance Company
River Thames Insurance Company Limited
Zurich American Insurance Company
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Christopher D. Loizides
Derek C. Abbott
Andrew R. Remming
Paige Noelle Topper
Tori Lynn Remington
James E. O'Neill, III
Rachel B. Mersky
Kenneth John Enos
Kevin A. Guerke
Robert Steven Brady
Edwin J. Harron
David M. Klauder
Thomas E. Patterson
Erin R. Fay
Gregory Joseph Flasser
Robert D. Cecil, Jr.
Matthew Gernet Summers
Kurt F. Gwynne
Mark William Eckard
Robert Craig Martin
(#12) Joint Designation of Additional Items To Be Included In The Record On Appeal, filed by Boy Scouts of America, Delaware BSA, LLC. (Remington, Tori) Modified on 10/7/2022 (nms). (Entered: 10/06/2022)
(#11) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric R. Goodman, David J. Molton, Cameron Moxley and Tristan Axelrod - filed by Coalition of Abused Scouts for Justice. (Mersky, Rachel) (Entered: 10/06/2022)
(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel B. Mersky on behalf of Coalition of Abused Scouts for Justice (Mersky, Rachel) (Entered: 10/06/2022)
(#8) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jessica C. Lauria and Glenn M. Kurtz - filed by Boy Scouts of America, Delaware BSA, LLC. (Remington, Tori) (Entered: 10/05/2022)
Exhibit A
Main Document
Exhibit A
Main Document
(#14) ORDER Granting Motion on Stipulation Regarding Appeal From Order Confirming Plan of Reorganization of Boy Scouts of America and Delaware BSA, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/17/2022. (nms) (Entered: 10/17/2022)
Exhibit 1
Main Document
(#2) NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (lam) (Main Document 2 replaced on 9/23/2022) (lam). (Entered: 09/23/2022)
Order On Appeal
Exhibit A
Opinion on appeal
Bankruptcy Court Transmittal
Order on Appeal
Main Document
Docket(#14) ORDER Granting Motion on Stipulation Regarding Appeal From Order Confirming Plan of Reorganization of Boy Scouts of America and Delaware BSA, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/17/2022. (nms) (Entered: 10/17/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#13) PROPOSED Order re Motion on Stipulation Regarding Appeals from Order Confirming Plan of Reorganization of Boy Scouts of America and Delaware BSA, LLC (D.I. #3 ), by Boy Scouts of America, Delaware BSA, LLC, Delaware BSA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Abbott, Derek) Modified on 10/17/2022 (nms). (Entered: 10/17/2022)
[-] Read LessDocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Conference to discuss consolidation structure and an overall briefing schedule held on 10/7/2022. Counsel for Appellants: K. Miller, D. Richards, L. Rizzo, T. Weaver. M. Sawczuk, R. K. Hill, D. Fournier, M. Joyce, C. Brown, B. Sullivan, S. Ennis. Counsel for Appellees: D. Abbott, J. O'Neill, R. Brady, R. Mersky, M. Summers, S. Stamoulis, M. Eckard. The parties are to resubmit the motion with the agreed-to changes in terms of consolidation. The parties are also directed to reach out to Chambers once the answering briefs are filed. (Court Reporter Heather Triozzi.) Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-01237-RGA et al. (lah) (Entered: 10/24/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#12) Joint Designation of Additional Items To Be Included In The Record On Appeal, filed by Boy Scouts of America, Delaware BSA, LLC. (Remington, Tori) Modified on 10/7/2022 (nms). (Entered: 10/06/2022)
[-] Read LessDocketSO ORDERED, re #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric R. Goodman, David J. Molton, Cameron Moxley and Tristan Axelrod, filed by Coalition of Abused Scouts for Justice. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/6/2022. (nms) (Entered: 10/06/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#11) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric R. Goodman, David J. Molton, Cameron Moxley and Tristan Axelrod - filed by Coalition of Abused Scouts for Justice. (Mersky, Rachel) (Entered: 10/06/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel B. Mersky on behalf of Coalition of Abused Scouts for Justice (Mersky, Rachel) (Entered: 10/06/2022)
[-] Read LessDocketSO ORDERED, re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jessica C. Lauria and Glenn M. Kurtz, filed by Boy Scouts of America, Delaware BSA, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/6/2022. (nms) (Entered: 10/06/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Stamatios Stamoulis on behalf of Century Indemnity Company (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 10/05/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#8) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jessica C. Lauria and Glenn M. Kurtz - filed by Boy Scouts of America, Delaware BSA, LLC. (Remington, Tori) (Entered: 10/05/2022)
[-] Read LessDocketCORRECTING ENTRY: The "Statement" filed at D.I. 5 on 10/3/2022, has been removed from the docket. This filing was amended by the statement filed at D.I. #6 . (nms) (Entered: 10/04/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) AMENDED Statement of Issues on Appeal and Designation of the Record, filed by Tort Claimants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Loizides, Christopher) Modified on 10/4/2022 (nms). (Entered: 10/03/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) ORAL ORDER: A conference to discuss consolidation structure and an overall briefing schedule for the appeal is set for 10/7/2022, at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6A. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/30/2022. Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-01237-RGA et al.(nms) (Entered: 09/30/2022)
[-] Read LessDocketCORRECTING ENTRY: The pro hac motion filed at D.I. 4 on 9/28/2022, has been removed from the docket. The filing contained errors in the caption. First, it referenced cases that the filing party is not a member to. Second, incorrect initials were used after the case number. (nms) (Entered: 09/29/2022)
[-] Read LessDocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-01237-RGA through 1:22-cv-01247-RGA; 1:22-cv-01249-RGA through 1:22-cv-01252-RGA, 1:22-cv-01254-RGA, 1:22-cv-01258-RGA and 1:22-cv-01263-RGA (rjb) (Entered: 09/28/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) JOINT Motion for Consolidation and to Approve Stipulation Regarding Appeals from Order Confirming Plan of Reorganization of Boy Scouts of America and Delaware BSA, LLC - filed by Boy Scouts of America, Delaware BSA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Topper, Paige) Modified on 9/28/2022 (nms). (Entered: 09/27/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (lam) (Main Document 2 replaced on 9/23/2022) (lam). (Entered: 09/23/2022)
[-] Read LessDocketNO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED (lam) (Entered: 09/23/2022)
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. DESIGNATED RECORD on Appeal is available electronically from the docket sheet on file in the Bankruptcy Court. Please do not send paper courtesy copies of the record on appeal to the Clerk's Office unless otherwise directed by chambers. (lam) (Entered: 09/23/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Order entered on 9/12/2022 by Judge Laurie Selber Silverstein in Bankruptcy case number 20-10343-LSS. Fee Status Paid.- filed by Tort Claimants. (Attachments: #1 Order on Appeal, #2 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal, #3 Opinion on appeal, #4 Exhibit A)(lam) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/23/2022: #5 Order On Appeal) (lam). (Entered: 09/23/2022)
[-] Read Less