This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:21:41 (UTC).

TORRES v. TONE

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 TORRES filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against TONE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is PAUL S. DIAMOND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-05730

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PAUL S. DIAMOND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRANCISCO JOSE TORRES, JR.

Easton, PA 18042

Defendant

STEVE TONE

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL RETURN TO PLAINTIFF HIS UNSIGNED COMPLAINT AND SHALL RETAIN A COPY IN THE CIVIL ACTION FILE. IF PLAINTIFF SEEKS TO PROCEED IN THIS ACTION HE SHALL WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER SIGN AND RETURN IT TO THE CLERK OF COURT. FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER HIS CASE MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 12/9/19. 12/10/19 ENTERED AND COPY OF ORDER AND COMPLAINT MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF.(jpd, ) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against STEVE TONE, filed by FRANCISCO JOSE TORRES, JR. (IFP PENDING) (Attachments: #1 CASE FORMS)(jl, ) (Main Document 2 replaced on 12/20/2019) (jpd, ). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#1

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (jl, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#3

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) ORDERED THAT THIS CASE IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE AND THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 1/24/20. 1/27/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF. (jpd ) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

2 #1

CASE FORMS

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDERED THAT THIS CASE IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE AND THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 1/24/20. 1/27/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF. (jpd ) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL RETURN TO PLAINTIFF HIS UNSIGNED COMPLAINT AND SHALL RETAIN A COPY IN THE CIVIL ACTION FILE. IF PLAINTIFF SEEKS TO PROCEED IN THIS ACTION HE SHALL WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER SIGN AND RETURN IT TO THE CLERK OF COURT. FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER HIS CASE MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 12/9/19. 12/10/19 ENTERED AND COPY OF ORDER AND COMPLAINT MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF.(jpd, ) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (jl, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by FRANCISCO JOSE TORRES, JR. (jl, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against STEVE TONE, filed by FRANCISCO JOSE TORRES, JR. (IFP PENDING) (Attachments: #1 CASE FORMS)(jl, ) (Main Document 2 replaced on 12/20/2019) (jpd, ). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) FRANCISCO JOSE TORRES, JR. MOTION TO PROCEED INFORMA PAUPERIS.(jl, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.