This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/06/2021 at 10:34:14 (UTC).

Torres v. Gulf Coast Jacks, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/05/2021 Torres filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Gulf Coast Jacks, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Vanessa D Gilmore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00019

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vanessa D Gilmore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amalia Torres

Katy, TX 77449

Defendant

Gulf Coast Jacks, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Stacy Hoffman Bruce

Attorney at Cobb Martinez Woodward PLLC

1700 Pacific Ave, Ste 3100

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

4 #1

Proposed Order

#4

(#4) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Gulf Coast Jacks, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 1/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bruce, Stacy) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

#3

(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/16/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(GeorgeKelneradi, 4) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Gulf Coast Jacks, Inc., filed.(Bruce, Stacy) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

1 #4

Exhibit D-CIP

1 #3

Exhibit C-Pleadings

1 #2

Exhibit B-Docket

1 #1

Exhibit A-Index

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 133rd District Court, Harris County, case number 202077426 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-25752894) filed by Gulf Coast Jacks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Index, #2 Exhibit B-Docket, #3 Exhibit C-Pleadings, #4 Exhibit D-CIP)(Bruce, Stacy) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Gulf Coast Jacks, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 1/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bruce, Stacy) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/16/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(GeorgeKelneradi, 4) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Gulf Coast Jacks, Inc., filed.(Bruce, Stacy) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 133rd District Court, Harris County, case number 202077426 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-25752894) filed by Gulf Coast Jacks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Index, #2 Exhibit B-Docket, #3 Exhibit C-Pleadings, #4 Exhibit D-CIP)(Bruce, Stacy) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stacy Hoffman Bruce