This case was last updated from PACER on 01/17/2020 at 07:19:57 (UTC).

Torrents v. CARNIVAL CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 Torrents filed a Personal Injury - Marine lawsuit against CARNIVAL CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James Lawrence King and Jacqueline Becerra. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-24760

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James Lawrence King

Referral Judge

Jacqueline Becerra

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Angelina Torrents

Defendant

CARNIVAL CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peter Robert Hunt

Attorney at LaBovick Law Group

5220 Hood Road, Suite 200

Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418

Defendant Attorney

Donnise DeSouza Webb

Attorney at Carnival Cruise Lines

3655 Nw 87Th Avenue

Miami, FL 33178-2428

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by CARNIVAL CORPORATION (Webb, Donnise) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#8

(#8) Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates by Angelina Torrents (Hunt, Peter) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#7

(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Discovery due by 12/2/2020., Motions due by 12/7/2020., Pretrial Stipulation due by 1/29/2021., Jury Trial set for 4/26/2021 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King., Calendar Call set for 4/22/2021 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King., Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/5/2021 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King. All hearings to be held before Judge King will be held in Courtroom II, Eleventh Floor.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra for Discovery Matters. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 12/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (jw) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#6

(#6) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by CARNIVAL CORPORATION. (Webb, Donnise) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Donnise DeSouza Webb on behalf of CARNIVAL CORPORATION. Attorney Donnise DeSouza Webb added to party CARNIVAL CORPORATION (pty:dft). (Webb, Donnise) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Angelina Torrents. CARNIVAL CORPORATION served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019. (Hunt, Peter) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to CARNIVAL CORPORATION. (amb) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

1 #2

Summon(s)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ANGELINA TORRENTS against CARNIVAL CORPORATION d/b/a CARNIVAL CRUISE LINE. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12156113, filed by Angelina Torrents. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Hunt, Peter) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by CARNIVAL CORPORATION (Webb, Donnise) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates by Angelina Torrents (Hunt, Peter) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Discovery due by 12/2/2020., Motions due by 12/7/2020., Pretrial Stipulation due by 1/29/2021., Jury Trial set for 4/26/2021 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King., Calendar Call set for 4/22/2021 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King., Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/5/2021 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King. All hearings to be held before Judge King will be held in Courtroom II, Eleventh Floor.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra for Discovery Matters. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 12/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (jw) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by CARNIVAL CORPORATION. (Webb, Donnise) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Donnise DeSouza Webb on behalf of CARNIVAL CORPORATION. Attorney Donnise DeSouza Webb added to party CARNIVAL CORPORATION (pty:dft). (Webb, Donnise) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Angelina Torrents. CARNIVAL CORPORATION served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019. (Hunt, Peter) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to CARNIVAL CORPORATION. (amb) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James Lawrence King. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ANGELINA TORRENTS against CARNIVAL CORPORATION d/b/a CARNIVAL CRUISE LINE. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12156113, filed by Angelina Torrents. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Hunt, Peter) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.