This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/02/2022 at 09:42:31 (UTC).

Torrance Unified School District v. Juul Labs, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/03/2021 Torrance Unified School District filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Juul Labs, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is William H. Orrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-08542

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William H. Orrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Torrance Unified School District

Defendants

Juul Labs, Inc.

Altria Group, Inc.

Altria Client Services LLC

Altria Group Distribution Company

Philip Morris USA, Inc.

James Monsees

Adam Bowen

Nicholas Pritzker

Hoyoung Huh

Riaz Valani

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William B. Shinoff

Attorney at Frantz Law Group, APLC

402 W. Broadway, Suite 860

San Diego, CA 94101

James Patrick Frantz

Attorney at Frantz Law Group, APLC

402 W. Broadway, Suite 860

San Diego, CA 94101

 

Court Documents

7 #9

Certificate/Proof of Service

7 #8

Certificate/Proof of Service

7 #7

Certificate/Proof of Service

7 #6

Certificate/Proof of Service

7 #5

Certificate/Proof of Service

7 #4

Certificate/Proof of Service

7 #3

Certificate/Proof of Service

7 #2

Certificate/Proof of Service

7 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service

7 #7

Main Document

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Adam Bowen, Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Hoyoung Huh, James Monsees, Juul Labs, Inc., Nicholas Pritzker, Philip Morris USA, Inc., Riaz Valani. (bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2021) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#4

(#4) Civil Cover Sheet by Torrance Unified School District CORRECTION OF DOCKET #2 . (Frantz, James) (Filed on 11/3/2021) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons. (Frantz, James) (Filed on 11/3/2021) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet by Torrance Unified School District Correction of Docket #1 . (Frantz, James) (Filed on 11/3/2021) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Torrance Unified School District. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service, #6 Certificate/Proof of Service, #7 Certificate/Proof of Service, #8 Certificate/Proof of Service, #9 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Frantz, James) (Filed on 11/11/2021) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Adam Bowen, Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Hoyoung Huh, James Monsees, Juul Labs, Inc., Nicholas Pritzker, Philip Morris USA, Inc., Riaz Valani. (bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2021) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketDIRECT MEMBER CASE OPENED: MDL 19-2913 Opened in California Northern District as 3:21-cv-08542-WHO cc: JPMDL (bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2021) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Judge William H. Orrick. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2021) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Civil Cover Sheet by Torrance Unified School District CORRECTION OF DOCKET #2 . (Frantz, James) (Filed on 11/3/2021) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. (Frantz, James) (Filed on 11/3/2021) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet by Torrance Unified School District Correction of Docket #1 . (Frantz, James) (Filed on 11/3/2021) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-16586604.). Filed byTorrance Unified School District. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Frantz, James) (Filed on 11/3/2021) Modified on 11/4/2021 (bns, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less