This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/16/2022 at 07:45:49 (UTC).

Toritto v. Merchants' Credit Guide Co. et al

Case Summary

On 03/17/2022 Toritto filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Merchants' Credit Guide Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John Z. Lee. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01416

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Z. Lee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lisa Toritto

Defendants

Merchants' Credit Guide Co.

Equifax Information Service LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph Scott Davidson

Attorney at Law Offices of Joseph P. Doyle, LLC

105 South Roselle Road, Suite 203

Schaumburg, IL 60193

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Lisa Toritto; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19256527. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lisa Toritto by Joseph Scott Davidson (Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Lisa Toritto. Equifax Information Service LLC waiver sent on 3/18/2022, answer due 5/17/2022. (Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#4

(#4) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:A Rule 16 initial status hearing is set for 5/26/22 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report by 5/19/22. The report should comply with the requirements for initial joint status reports set forth in the Initial Status Conference standing order, which can be found on the Court's website. In light of the COVID-19 pandemic and the related General Orders, the Court finds that it is necessary to conduct the status hearing via telephone conference. The call-in number is 888-273-3658 and the access code is 1637578. Counsel of record will receive a separate email at least 12 hours prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions on how to join the call. All persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in court-imposed sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. All participants should review the Court's standing order regarding telephone conferences that is on Judge Lee's website, which can be found at: https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?4Qf5zc8loCI5U7rfMP9DHw==. (ca, ) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Lisa Toritto. Merchants' Credit Guide Co. waiver sent on 3/18/2022, answer due 5/17/2022. (Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE by Lisa Toritto of Settlement with Merchants' Credit Guide Co. (Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE by Lisa Toritto of Settlement with Equifax Information Services LLC (Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

#8

(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:In light of the parties' notices of settlement #6 , #7 this case is dismissed without prejudice. The dismissal will become with prejudice in 30 days. Civil Case terminated. (ca, ) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:In light of the parties' notices of settlement #6 , #7 this case is dismissed without prejudice. The dismissal will become with prejudice in 30 days. Civil Case terminated. (ca, ) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE by Lisa Toritto of Settlement with Equifax Information Services LLC (Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE by Lisa Toritto of Settlement with Merchants' Credit Guide Co. (Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Lisa Toritto. Merchants' Credit Guide Co. waiver sent on 3/18/2022, answer due 5/17/2022. (Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:A Rule 16 initial status hearing is set for 5/26/22 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report by 5/19/22. The report should comply with the requirements for initial joint status reports set forth in the Initial Status Conference standing order, which can be found on the Court's website. In light of the COVID-19 pandemic and the related General Orders, the Court finds that it is necessary to conduct the status hearing via telephone conference. The call-in number is 888-273-3658 and the access code is 1637578. Counsel of record will receive a separate email at least 12 hours prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions on how to join the call. All persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in court-imposed sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. All participants should review the Court's standing order regarding telephone conferences that is on Judge Lee's website, which can be found at: https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?4Qf5zc8loCI5U7rfMP9DHw==. (ca, ) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Lisa Toritto. Equifax Information Service LLC waiver sent on 3/18/2022, answer due 5/17/2022. (Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jk2, ) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jk2, ) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lisa Toritto by Joseph Scott Davidson (Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Lisa Toritto; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19256527. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Merchants Credit Guide Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Equifax Information Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Scott Davidson