This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/06/2022 at 08:48:29 (UTC).

Torchlight Technologies LLC v. General Motors LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/07/2022 Torchlight Technologies LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against General Motors LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Vacant Judgeship (2022). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00752

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vacant Judgeship (2022)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Torchlight Technologies LLC

Defendants

General Motors LLC

General Motors Holdings LLC

General Motors Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kenneth Laurence Dorsney

Attorney at Morris James LLP

500 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1500

Wilmington, DE 19899-2306

Cortlan S. Hitch

Attorney at Morris James LLP

500 Delaware Ave, Ste 1500

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit 1-3

1 #2

Exhibit G1-G8

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,955,551; 10,894,503; 11,208,029. (twk) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Torchlight Technologies LLC. (twk) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

#14

(#6) VAC Notice, Consent, Non-Consent, Magistrate Referral Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-00751-VAC, 1:22-cv-00752-VAC (ntl) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) VAC Notice, Consent, Non-Consent, Magistrate Referral Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-00751-VAC, 1:22-cv-00752-VAC (ntl) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • Docket(#5) ORAL ORDER: This case has been assigned to the District of Delaware's Vacant Judgeship ("VAC"). Detailed information relating to VAC cases may be found in the Court's Announcement of March 3, 2022 and Standing Order No. 2022-VAC-1 (March 9, 2022), which are found on the Court's website. Consistent with the foregoing Announcement and Standing Order, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file the "Notice of Consent or Absence of Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge," being docketed along with the instant order, no later than sixty (60) days after service of the Complaint on the first defendant that is served. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Notice, Consent, and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction, previously docketed in this case, are VACATED. Issued by the Clerk of Court on 6/15/2022. Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-00751-VAC, 1:22-cv-00752-VAC (ntl) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Vacant Judgeship (2022). Please include initials of VAC after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-00751-VAC, 1:22-cv-00752-VAC (rjb) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketNo Summons Issued. (twk) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Torchlight Technologies LLC. (twk) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,955,551; 10,894,503; 11,208,029. (twk) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against General Motors Company, General Motors Holdings LLC, General Motors LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3890973.) - filed by Torchlight Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-3, #2 Exhibit G1-G8, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(twk) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cortlan S. Hitch

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kenneth Laurence Dorsney