This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/06/2022 at 08:33:27 (UTC).

Torchlight Technologies LLC v. Daimler AG et al

Case Summary

On June 7, 2022, Torchlight Technologies LLC (“Torchlight” or “Plaintiff”), represented by Cortlan S. Hitch and Kenneth L. Dorsney of Morris James LLP, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Daimler AG, Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, Volkswagen AG, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., Audi AG, Audi of America, LLC, Porsche AG, and Porsche Cars North America, (collectively “Defendants”), seeking declaratory relief and damages for the alleged infringement of U.S. Patent Nos. 9,955,551 (“the ’551 patent”), 10,894,503 (“the ’503 patent”) and 11,208,029 (“the ’029 patent”) owned by the plaintiff. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the District of Delaware.

Plaintiff stated that “Torchlight is the exclusive licensee of the patent, with the right to enforce all the patents in suit, and the right to sue Defendants for infringement and recover past damages.”

The plaintiff claimed that “the Multi-Row Headlamp system includes at least one processor configured to process the sensor data to identify a first subsection of a field of view that includes at least a portion of the second vehicle and to determine and instruct a light output such that illumination aimed at the first subsection results in light below a first predefined illuminance, and that aims illumination to either side of the first subsection resulting in light above the first predefined illuminance.”

In the complaint, the plaintiff alleged, “Defendant’s are responsible for and/or is in the business of designing, manufacturing, importing, advertising, marketing, distributing, offering to sell and/or selling motor vehicles and components under Defendants brands, such as Mercedes-Benz, in all 50 states, including in this District, including motor vehicles having certain vehicle illuminating devices and components of such devices that are accused of infringement herein, and such motor vehicles and components are imported, used, offered for sale, sold and/or made in the United States, including in this District, by and/or on behalf of Daimler AG.” 

Plaintiff additionally alleged, “Such infringement is described below based on publicly available information with respect to example claim 1 as to the example Daimler/Mercedes Multi-Row Headlamp system having 84 separately controllable LEDs (‘Multi-Row Headlamp system’). Daimler/Mercedes has installed these devices in its vehicles and sold the vehicles to or through dealers throughout the U.S.”

The plaintiff presented nine claims for the alleged direct and indirect infringement of the 9,955,551, 10,894,503 and 11,208,029 patents.

In its prayer for relief the plaintiff requested a judgment granting declaratory relief together with an award of damages suffered as a result of Defendant’s infringement of the Patents in suit including pre-judgment and post-judgment interest along with costs and expenses. 

This is a summary of a legal complaint. All statements, claims, and allegations listed herein reflect the position of the plaintiff only and do not represent the position of UniCourt. Additionally, this case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the current status of this case. To view the latest case updates and court documents, please sign up for a UniCourt account.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00751

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vacant Judgeship (2022)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Torchlight Technologies LLC

Defendants

Daimler AG

Volkswagen AG

Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.

Audi AG

Audi of America, LLC

Porsche AG

Porsche Cars North America, Inc.

Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cortlan S. Hitch

Attorney at Morris James LLP

500 Delaware Ave, Ste 1500

Wilmington, DE 19801

Kenneth Laurence Dorsney

Attorney at Morris James LLP

500 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1500

Wilmington, DE 19899-2306

Defendant Attorneys

Adam Wyatt Poff

Attorney at Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP

1000 North King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Francis DiGiovanni

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

222 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1410

Wilmington, DE 19801

Edgar H. Haug

Robert E. Colletti

Jack B. Blumenfeld

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC to move, answer or otherwise respond to the complaint to August 29, 2022 - filed by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

#21

(#21) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. and Audi of America, LLC to answer, plead, or otherwise respond to the complaint to August 29, 2022 - filed by Audi of America, LLC, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Poff, Adam) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

#20

(#20) STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint by Porsche Cars North America, Inc.. (DiGiovanni, Francis) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

#19

(#19) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Edgar H. Haug and Robert E. Colletti - filed by Porsche Cars North America, Inc.. (DiGiovanni, Francis) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Francis DiGiovanni on behalf of Porsche Cars North America, Inc. (DiGiovanni, Francis) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC on 6/7/2022. (mpb) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. on 6/7/2022. (mpb) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Porsche Cars North America, Inc. on 6/7/2022. (mpb) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Audi of America, LLC on 6/7/2022. (mpb) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Torchlight Technologies LLC. (mpb) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,955,551 ;10,894,503 ;11,208,029. (mpb) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mpb) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit P1-P3

1 #3

Exhibit M1-M6

1 #2

Exhibit A1-A4

1 #1

Exhibit 1-3

1 #1

Main Document

14 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #22 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC to move, answer or otherwise respond to the complaint to August 29, 2022 filed by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC -- Reset Answer Deadline: Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC answer due 8/29/2022. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/5/22. (ntl) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC to move, answer or otherwise respond to the complaint to August 29, 2022 - filed by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #21 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. and Audi of America, LLC to answer, plead, or otherwise respond to the complaint to August 29, 2022 filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., Audi of America, LLC. Reset Answer Deadlines: Audi of America, LLC answer due 8/29/2022; Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. answer due 8/29/2022. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/4/2022. (etg) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. and Audi of America, LLC to answer, plead, or otherwise respond to the complaint to August 29, 2022 - filed by Audi of America, LLC, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Poff, Adam) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #20 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint by Porsche Cars North America, Inc. Reset Answer Deadlines: Porsche Cars North America, Inc. answer due 8/29/2022. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/2/2022. (etg) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint by Porsche Cars North America, Inc.. (DiGiovanni, Francis) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Robert E. Colletti and Edgar H. Haug for Porsche Cars North America, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #19 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Edgar H. Haug and Robert E. Colletti filed by Porsche Cars North America, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/12/2022. (etg) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Edgar H. Haug and Robert E. Colletti - filed by Porsche Cars North America, Inc.. (DiGiovanni, Francis) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Francis DiGiovanni on behalf of Porsche Cars North America, Inc. (DiGiovanni, Francis) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Torchlight Technologies LLC. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. served on 6/8/2022, answer due 6/29/2022. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Torchlight Technologies LLC. Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC served on 6/8/2022, answer due 6/29/2022. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC on 6/7/2022. (mpb) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. on 6/7/2022. (mpb) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Porsche Cars North America, Inc. on 6/7/2022. (mpb) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Audi of America, LLC on 6/7/2022. (mpb) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Torchlight Technologies LLC. (mpb) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,955,551 ;10,894,503 ;11,208,029. (mpb) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mpb) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Audi AG, Audi of America, LLC, Daimler AG, Porsche AG, Porsche Cars North America, Inc., Volkswagen AG, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3890826.) - filed by Torchlight Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-3, #2 Exhibit A1-A4, #3 Exhibit M1-M6, #4 Exhibit P1-P3, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(mpb) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Porsche AG is a litigant

Latest cases where DAIMLER AG is a litigant

Latest cases where PORSCHE CARS NORTH AMERICA INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where AUDI OF AMERICA INC. is a litigant