This case was last updated from PACER on 07/06/2021 at 09:51:31 (UTC).

Topliff v. Standard Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 05/07/2021 Topliff filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Standard Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan M Brnovich. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00826

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan M Brnovich

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Connie Topliff

Defendant

Standard Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brent Dorian Brehm

Attorney at Kantor & Kantor LLP

19839 Nordhoff St

Northridge, CA 91324

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Connie Topliff: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 5/20/21 to Standard Insurance Company . (Brehm, Brent) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on 8/05/2021. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 5/12/2021. (ESG) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 5/12/2021. (ESG) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER Any motions, responses or replies filed for which a courtesy copy is not delivered to the Court, as required, will be stricken and not considered. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 5/12/2021. (ESG) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Standard Insurance Company. (MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 05/10/2021)

#3

(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19445633. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-826-PHX-SMB Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Connie Topliff. (Brehm, Brent) (MCO) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19445633 filed by Connie Topliff. (Brehm, Brent) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCO) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Connie Topliff: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 5/20/21 to Standard Insurance Company . (Brehm, Brent) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on 8/05/2021. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 5/12/2021. (ESG) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 5/12/2021. (ESG) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER Any motions, responses or replies filed for which a courtesy copy is not delivered to the Court, as required, will be stricken and not considered. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 5/12/2021. (ESG) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Brent Dorian Brehm on behalf of Plaintiff Connie Topliff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Connie Topliff. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MCO) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Standard Insurance Company. (MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19445633. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-826-PHX-SMB Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Connie Topliff. (Brehm, Brent) (MCO) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19445633 filed by Connie Topliff. (Brehm, Brent) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCO) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Standard Insurance Co. Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brent Dorian Brehm