This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/27/2023 at 07:31:35 (UTC).

Topia Technology, Inc. v. Sailpoint Technologies Holdings, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/29/2022 Topia Technology, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Sailpoint Technologies Holdings, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-01318

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Topia Technology, Inc.

Defendants and Counter Plaintiffs

Sailpoint Technologies Holdings, Inc.

Clear Channel Outdoor Holdings, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Mark Boland

Chidambara Iyer

L. Roman Rachuba, II

Raja Saliba

Raymond W Mort, III

Defendant and Counter Plaintiff Attorneys

Amanda N. Brouillette

Andrew N. Saul

Steven R. Borgman

Edward J. Mayle

Fred I. Williams

John Wittenzellner

Michael Simons

Todd E. Landis

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) ANSWER to #15 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Topia Technology, Inc..(ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of filing Joint Claim Construction Statement by Topia Technology, Inc. re #10 Claim Construction Brief. (ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

#16

(#16) Sur-Reply Claim Construction Brief regarding #13 Claim Construction Brief by Topia Technology, Inc.. (ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

#15

(#15) ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Topia Technology, Inc. by Clear Channel Outdoor Holdings, Inc..(ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

#14

(#14) ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Sailpoint Technologies Holdings, Inc..(ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

#13

(#13) Reply Claim Construction Brief regarding #10 Claim Construction Brief by Clear Channel Outdoor Holdings, Inc.. (ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

#12

(#12) Brief Reply Claim Construction Brief regarding #10 Claim Construction Brief by Topia Technology, Inc.. (ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

#11

(#11) Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending #4 Amended Complaint., filed by Topia Technology, Inc..(ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

#10

(#10) Opening Claim Construction Brief by Clear Channel Outdoor Holdings, Inc.. (ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #7 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim, COUNTERCLAIM against Clear Channel Outdoor Holdings, Inc. by Topia Technology, Inc..(ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

#8

(#8) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Clear Channel Outdoor Holdings, Inc.. (ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Topia Technology, Inc. by Clear Channel Outdoor Holdings, Inc..(ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Sailpoint Technologies Holdings, Inc..(ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

#5

(#5) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sailpoint Technologies Holdings, Inc.. (ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

#4

(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Clear Channel Outdoor Holdings, Inc., Sailpoint Technologies Holdings, Inc. amending #1 Complaint., filed by Topia Technology, Inc..(ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

#3

(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Topia Technology, Inc.. (ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

#2

(#2) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15569701), filed by Topia Technology, Inc..(ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketCase severed from original case 6:21-cv-1373. (bw) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ANSWER to #15 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Topia Technology, Inc..(ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of filing Joint Claim Construction Statement by Topia Technology, Inc. re #10 Claim Construction Brief. (ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Sur-Reply Claim Construction Brief regarding #13 Claim Construction Brief by Topia Technology, Inc.. (ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Topia Technology, Inc. by Clear Channel Outdoor Holdings, Inc..(ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Sailpoint Technologies Holdings, Inc..(ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Reply Claim Construction Brief regarding #10 Claim Construction Brief by Clear Channel Outdoor Holdings, Inc.. (ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Brief Reply Claim Construction Brief regarding #10 Claim Construction Brief by Topia Technology, Inc.. (ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending #4 Amended Complaint., filed by Topia Technology, Inc..(ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Opening Claim Construction Brief by Clear Channel Outdoor Holdings, Inc.. (ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #7 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim, COUNTERCLAIM against Clear Channel Outdoor Holdings, Inc. by Topia Technology, Inc..(ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Clear Channel Outdoor Holdings, Inc.. (ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Topia Technology, Inc. by Clear Channel Outdoor Holdings, Inc..(ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Sailpoint Technologies Holdings, Inc..(ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sailpoint Technologies Holdings, Inc.. (ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Clear Channel Outdoor Holdings, Inc., Sailpoint Technologies Holdings, Inc. amending #1 Complaint., filed by Topia Technology, Inc..(ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Topia Technology, Inc.. (ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15569701), filed by Topia Technology, Inc..(ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less