This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/27/2023 at 09:06:33 (UTC).

Topia Technology, Inc. v. Sailpoint Technologies Holdings, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/29/2022 Topia Technology, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Sailpoint Technologies Holdings, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-01317

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Topia Technology, Inc.

Defendants

Sailpoint Technologies Holdings, Inc.

Vistra Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

L. Roman Rachuba

Mark Boland

Raymond W Mort, III

Chidambara Iyer

Raja Saliba

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew N. Saul

Edward J. Mayle

Steven R. Borgman

Amanda N. Brouillette

Naina Soni

Heidi L. Keefe

Lowell D. Mead

Reuben H. Chen

9 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15569662), filed by Topia Technology, Inc..(ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

#2

(#2) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

#3

(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Topia Technology, Inc.. (ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

#4

(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sailpoint Technologies Holdings, Inc., Vistra Corp. amending #1 Complaint., filed by Topia Technology, Inc..(ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

#5

(#5) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sailpoint Technologies Holdings, Inc.. (ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Sailpoint Technologies Holdings, Inc..(ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Vistra Corp..(ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

#8

(#8) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Vistra Corp.. (ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

#9

(#9) Opening Claim Construction Brief by Vistra Corp.. (ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

#10

(#10) Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sailpoint Technologies Holdings, Inc., Vistra Corp. amending #4 Amended Complaint., filed by Topia Technology, Inc..(ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

#11

(#11) Reply Claim Construction Brief regarding #9 Claim Construction Brief by Topia Technology, Inc.. (ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

#12

(#12) Reply Claim Construction Brief regarding #9 Claim Construction Brief by Vistra Corp.. (ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Sailpoint Technologies Holdings, Inc..(ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

#14

(#14) ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Vistra Corp..(ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

#15

(#15) Sur-Reply Claim Construction Brief regarding #11 Claim Construction Brief by Topia Technology, Inc.. (ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

#16

(#16) NOTICE OF FILING JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT by Topia Technology, Inc. re #9 Claim Construction Brief. (ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

#17

(#17) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SEVER; GRANTING MOTION TO STAY CASE. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SEVER; GRANTING MOTION TO STAY CASE. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF FILING JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT by Topia Technology, Inc. re #9 Claim Construction Brief. (ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Sur-Reply Claim Construction Brief regarding #11 Claim Construction Brief by Topia Technology, Inc.. (ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Vistra Corp..(ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Sailpoint Technologies Holdings, Inc..(ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Reply Claim Construction Brief regarding #9 Claim Construction Brief by Vistra Corp.. (ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Reply Claim Construction Brief regarding #9 Claim Construction Brief by Topia Technology, Inc.. (ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sailpoint Technologies Holdings, Inc., Vistra Corp. amending #4 Amended Complaint., filed by Topia Technology, Inc..(ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Opening Claim Construction Brief by Vistra Corp.. (ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Vistra Corp.. (ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Vistra Corp..(ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Sailpoint Technologies Holdings, Inc..(ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sailpoint Technologies Holdings, Inc.. (ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sailpoint Technologies Holdings, Inc., Vistra Corp. amending #1 Complaint., filed by Topia Technology, Inc..(ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Topia Technology, Inc.. (ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15569662), filed by Topia Technology, Inc..(ad3) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less