This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/25/2022 at 08:08:26 (UTC).

Topia Technology, Inc. v. Egnyte, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/27/2021 Topia Technology, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Egnyte, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Maryellen Noreika and Christopher J. Burke. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01821

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maryellen Noreika

Referral Judge

Christopher J. Burke

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Topia Technology, Inc.

Defendant

Egnyte, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kelly E. Farnan

Defendant Attorneys

Carl Douglas Neff

Christopher R. Kinkade

Ryan T. Beard

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Egnyte, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3770729.) - filed by Topia Technology, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-7, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit 1-7

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,143,561 ;10,067,942 ;10,289,607 ;10,642,787 ;10,754,813. (apk) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Topia Technology, Inc.. (apk) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Egnyte, Inc. on 12/27/2021. (apk) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Topia Technology, Inc.. Egnyte, Inc. served on 12/28/2021, answer due 1/18/2022. (Farnan, Kelly) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Douglas Neff on behalf of Egnyte, Inc. (Neff, Carl) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, - filed by Egnyte, Inc.. (Neff, Carl) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#10

(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re SO ORDERED, Set/Reset Answer Deadline(s) 03/07/2022 - filed by Egnyte, Inc.. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Neff, Carl) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#11

(#11) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher R. Kinkade, Esq - filed by Egnyte, Inc.. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Neff, Carl) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#12

(#12) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ryan T. Beard, Esq - filed by Egnyte, Inc.. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Neff, Carl) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorneys Ryan T. Beard and Christopher R. Kinkade for Egnyte, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (srs) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED D.I. #12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ryan T. Beard, Esq filed by Egnyte, Inc., #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher R. Kinkade, Esq filed by Egnyte, Inc. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 2/9/2020. (dlb) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ryan T. Beard, Esq - filed by Egnyte, Inc.. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Neff, Carl) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher R. Kinkade, Esq - filed by Egnyte, Inc.. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Neff, Carl) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED D.I. #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 3/7/2022. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 2/8/2022. (dlb) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re SO ORDERED, Set/Reset Answer Deadline(s) 03/07/2022 - filed by Egnyte, Inc.. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Neff, Carl) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketRemark: The parties should follow the Court's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, a copy of which is found on Judge Burke's portion of the District Court's webpage: https://www.ded.uscourts.gov/judge/magistrate-judge-christopher-j-burke (dlb) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketREMARK: The parties should be aware that the Court encourages the participation of newer attorneys in courtroom proceedings and at oral argument. Please see the Court's Standing Order Regarding Courtroom Opportunities for Newer Attorneys, a link to which is provided here for the parties' convenience:#http://www.ded.uscourts.gov/sites/ded/files/forms/StandingOrder2017.pdf (dlb) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • Docket(#9) ORAL ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke to hear and resolve all pre-trial matters up to and including expert discovery matters (but not including summary judgment motions, Daubert motions, pre-trial motions in limine or the pre-trial conference), subject to 28 U.S.C. 636(b) and any further Order of the Court. All subsequent filings in this action shall be captioned as follows: Civil Action No. 21-1821-MN-CJB. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/3/2022. (dlw) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Egnyte, Inc. answer due 2/17/2022). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/13/2022. (dlw) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, - filed by Egnyte, Inc.. (Neff, Carl) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Douglas Neff on behalf of Egnyte, Inc. (Neff, Carl) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Topia Technology, Inc.. Egnyte, Inc. served on 12/28/2021, answer due 1/18/2022. (Farnan, Kelly) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Egnyte, Inc. on 12/27/2021. (apk) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Topia Technology, Inc.. (apk) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,143,561 ;10,067,942 ;10,289,607 ;10,642,787 ;10,754,813. (apk) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Egnyte, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3770729.) - filed by Topia Technology, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-7, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less