This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/07/2023 at 07:54:19 (UTC).

Topia Technology, Inc. v. Box, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2023 Topia Technology, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Box, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jacqueline Scott Corley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-00063

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jacqueline Scott Corley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Topia Technology, Inc.

Defendants

Box, Inc.

Sailpoint Technologies Holdings, Inc.

Vistra Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Chidambara Iyer

L. Roman Rachuba

Mark Boland

Raja Saliba

Benjamin A. Katzenellenbogen

Ebenesar Davidson Thomas

Geoffrey Mason

J. Warren Lytle, Jr.

Janvi Umesh Shah

Lawrence Roman Rachuba, II

Raja N Saliba

Raymond W Mort, III

Defendant Attorneys

Heidi L. Keefe

Naina Soni

Reuben H. Chen

Lowell D. Mead

Amanda N Brouillette

Andrew N. Saul

Edward J. Mayle

Steven R. Borgman

8 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#107

(#107) ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #105 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Geoffrey C. Mason. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2023) (Entered: 03/03/2023)

#106

(#106) JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Topia Technology, Inc.. (Katzenellenbogen, Benjamin) (Filed on 3/2/2023) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

#105

(#105) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Geoffrey C. Mason ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18035619.) filed by Topia Technology, Inc.. (Mason, Geoffrey) (Filed on 3/2/2023) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

#104

(#104) Certificate of Interested Entities by Box, Inc. (Mead, Lowell) (Filed on 3/1/2023) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

#103

(#103) Refund Status re #101 Application for Refund, #11 Statement Approved. (rgh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2023) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

#102

(#102) ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #100 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Janvi Umesh Shah. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2023) (Entered: 02/16/2023)

#101

(#101) Application for Refund, Receipt Number ACANDC-17987538 by Topia Technology, Inc.. (Thomas, Ebenesar) (Filed on 2/15/2023) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

#100

(#100) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Janvi Umesh Shah ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17991953.) filed by Topia Technology, Inc.. (Shah, Janvi Umesh) (Filed on 2/15/2023) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

#11

(#103) Refund Status re #101 Application for Refund, #11 Statement Approved. (rgh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2023) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

1 #7

Exhibit

1 #6

Exhibit

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

203 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#107) ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #105 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Geoffrey C. Mason. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2023) (Entered: 03/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#106) JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Topia Technology, Inc.. (Katzenellenbogen, Benjamin) (Filed on 3/2/2023) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#105) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Geoffrey C. Mason ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18035619.) filed by Topia Technology, Inc.. (Mason, Geoffrey) (Filed on 3/2/2023) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#104) Certificate of Interested Entities by Box, Inc. (Mead, Lowell) (Filed on 3/1/2023) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#103) Refund Status re #101 Application for Refund, #11 Statement Approved. (rgh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2023) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#102) ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #100 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Janvi Umesh Shah. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2023) (Entered: 02/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#101) Application for Refund, Receipt Number ACANDC-17987538 by Topia Technology, Inc.. (Thomas, Ebenesar) (Filed on 2/15/2023) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#100) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Janvi Umesh Shah ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17991953.) filed by Topia Technology, Inc.. (Shah, Janvi Umesh) (Filed on 2/15/2023) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#99) ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting (106) Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Ebenesar Thomas in case 3:23-cv-00062-JSC; granting (98) Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Ebenesar Thomas in case 3:23-cv-00063-JSC. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2023) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#98) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Ebenesar Thomas ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17987798.) filed by Topia Technology, Inc.. (Thomas, Ebenesar) (Filed on 2/14/2023) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
95 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven R. Borgman on behalf of Sailpoint Technologies Holdings, Inc.. Attorney Steven R. Borgman added to party Sailpoint Technologies Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft) (Borgman, Steven) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending #1 , filed by Topia Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bw) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Vistra Corp.. (bw) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Sailpoint Technologies Holdings, Inc.. (bw) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Box, Inc.. (bw) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Topia Technology, Inc.. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Topia Technology, Inc.. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15569662), filed by Topia Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less