This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/29/2020 at 18:41:03 (UTC).

Topdown Licensing LLC v. Gibson Brands, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/30/2020 Topdown Licensing LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Gibson Brands, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Maryellen Noreika. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00890

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maryellen Noreika

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Topdown Licensing LLC

Defendant

Gibson Brands, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jimmy C. Chong

Attorney at The Chong Law Firm, P.A.

2961 Centerville Road, Suite 350

Wilmington, DE 19808

Defendant Attorney

Rick S. Miller

Attorney at Ferry Joseph, P.A.

824 Market St., Suite 1000, P.O. Box 1351

Wilmington, DE 19899

 

Court Documents

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#9

(#9) Second UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re SO ORDERED, Set/Reset Answer Deadline(s) - filed by Gibson Brands, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Rick) Modified on 8/21/2020 (dlw). (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Neal Massand - filed by Topdown Licensing LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#7

(#7) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint - filed by Gibson Brands, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Rick) Modified on 7/10/2020 (dlw). (Entered: 07/10/2020)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Topdown Licensing LLC. Gibson Brands, Inc. served on 7/1/2020, answer due 7/22/2020. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

#5

(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (mal) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Topdown Licensing LLC. (mal) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,835,739 ;8,178,773 ;7,858,870. (mal) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit D

1 #6

Exhibit C-1

1 #5

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit B-1

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A-1

1 #1

Exhibit A

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #9 Second UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Gibson Brands, Inc. answer due 9/23/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 8/21/2020. (dlw) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Second UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re SO ORDERED, Set/Reset Answer Deadline(s) - filed by Gibson Brands, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Rick) Modified on 8/21/2020 (dlw). (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Neal Massand filed by Topdown Licensing LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 7/21/2020. (dlw) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Neal Massand - filed by Topdown Licensing LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Gibson Brands, Inc. answer due 8/23/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 7/10/2020. (dlw) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint - filed by Gibson Brands, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Rick) Modified on 7/10/2020 (dlw). (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Topdown Licensing LLC. Gibson Brands, Inc. served on 7/1/2020, answer due 7/22/2020. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00888-MN, 1:20-cv-00889-MN, 1:20-cv-00890-MN, 1:20-cv-00891-MN (rjb) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (mal) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Topdown Licensing LLC. (mal) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,835,739 ;8,178,773 ;7,858,870. (mal) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Gibson Brands, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3027686.) - filed by Topdown Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit B-1, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit C-1, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Topdown Licensing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Gibson Brands, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rick S. Miller