This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/24/2020 at 07:09:16 (UTC).

Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Joan H. Lefkow. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-07762

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joan H. Lefkow

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC

Defendants

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

ZYM Cosmetic Store

Let You Beautiful Store

moonandstar_inthesky

su-554

Shop5366224 Store

Loumesi Official Store

BeautySnake Store

tyghf5219

Worldwide Dropship Store

Shop5001354 Store

lovemoon makeup Store

Shop5029021 Store

Gesang ABUC Store

yitao64

lzl8218

feimi-80

lsx56

duan7274

23 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Allyson M. Martin

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Amy Crout Ziegler

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Dr., Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Justin R. Gaudio

Attorney at Greer Burns & Crain Ltd

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Abby Marie Neu

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain

300 S Wacker, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#42

#36

25 #4

Schedule A

25 #3

Exhibit 3

15 #1

Exhibit 3-1

10 #3

Schedule A

10 #2

Exhibit 2

10 #1

Exhibit 1

#10

8 #1

exhibit

#8

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER signed by the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 1/14/2020. Mailed notice (ags) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Motion for preliminary injunction #36 is granted. The Clerk's office is directed to unseal: Plaintiff's Amended Complaint #10 and Exhibits 1 and 2 thereto [10-1] and [10-2], Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint #25 and Exhibits 1, 2, and 3 thereto [25-1], [25-2], and [25-3], Schedule A to the Complaint #7 , the Amended Complaint [10-3], and the Second Amended Complaint [25-4], Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Jessica Heiss #15 , and the TRO #30 . Motion hearing set for 1/15/2020 is stricken. Enter preliminary injunction order. Mailed notice (ags, ) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 1/10/2020, answer due 1/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Abby Neu)(Neu, Abby) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC by Abby Marie Neu (Neu, Abby) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #36 before Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 1/15/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) MEMORANDUM by Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC in support of motion for preliminary injunction #36 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) MOTION by Plaintiff Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC for preliminary injunction (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketBOND in the amount of $10,000.00 check, Receipt No. 4624235503, posted by Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC (axc, ) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) EXTENSION of Temporary Restraining Order Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 12/19/2019. Mailed notice(las, ) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion to extend temporary restraining order #31 is granted. Parties need not appear. Mailed notice (ewf, ) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) E-MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials (las, ) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) E-MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (Attachments: #1 exhibit)(las, ) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey I. Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kl, ) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 1/15/2020 (las, ). (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC by Allyson M. Martin (Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16473503. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Schedule A)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Allyson M. Martin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Abby Marie Neu