This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/22/2019 at 07:04:53 (UTC).

Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Case Summary

On 07/24/2019 Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Sharon Johnson Coleman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-04967

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sharon Johnson Coleman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC

Defendants

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

xiliansh

msu_93

Prettyrule Store

ay by day Store

b5g3ub

sxh56

TaoTing Store

Beauty cosmetic mall

xuwudic

WL Beautiful Makeup Store

Bai Gong Zi Store

yiqiao3688

whatsapp008618059528228 Store

zaidi6_20

txf56

vmos92006172yue4

weijiezhangz

srr56

32 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Allyson M. Martin

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Amy Crout Ziegler

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Dr., Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Justin R. Gaudio

Attorney at Greer Burns & Crain Ltd

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Martin Francis Trainor

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Abby Marie Neu

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain

300 S Wacker, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#44

#43

#42

#41

40 #2

Exhibit 1

40 #1

Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio

#40

#39

#38

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Schedule A

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

67 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) FINAL JUDGMENT ORDER Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 9/18/2019. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Motion hearing held on 9/18/2019. Plaintiff's motion for entry of default and for default judgment #39 is granted. Default judgement is entered in favor of plaintiff and against all defendants. Final Judgment Order. Status hearing set for 10/28/2019 is stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC by Martin Francis Trainor (Trainor, Martin) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for entry of default, motion for default judgment #39 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 9/18/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) MEMORANDUM by Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC in support of motion for entry of default, motion for default judgment #39 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) MOTION by Plaintiff Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC for entry of default as to all defendants, MOTION by Plaintiff Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC for default judgment as to all defendants (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC as to certain defendants (Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs as to a certain Defendant (Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 8/27/2019. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Motion hearing held on 8/27/2019. Plaintiff's motion for entry of a preliminary injunction #30 is granted. Enter Preliminary Injunction Order. Status hearing is set for 10/28/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (nsf, ) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials. (nsf, ) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MAILED Trademark report to Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (nsf, ) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, ) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC by Allyson M. Martin (Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16064010. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Schedule A)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Martin Francis Trainor

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Allyson M. Martin