This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/04/2019 at 09:10:14 (UTC).

Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Case Summary

On 04/29/2019 Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Gary Feinerman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02874

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gary Feinerman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC

Defendants

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Xi'an Zhizun Internation al Trade Cosmetics Co., Ltd

Shenzhen Fundy Technology Co., Ltd.

Shenzhen Beauty Secret Tech Co., Limited

Guangzhou Guweiduo International Trading Co., Ltd.2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Allyson M. Martin

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Amy Crout Ziegler

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Dr., Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Justin R. Gaudio

Attorney at Greer Burns & Crain Ltd

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Jake Michael Christensen

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain

300 S Wacker Drive, #2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Abby Marie Neu

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain

300 S Wacker, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#42

41 #2

Exhibit 1

41 #1

Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio

#41

#40

#39

#38

#37

#36

7 #1

Trademark

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

77 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for entry of default, motion for default judgment #40 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 7/8/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) MEMORANDUM by Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC in support of motion for entry of default, motion for default judgment #40 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) MOTION by Plaintiff Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC for entry of default as to all defendants, MOTION by Plaintiff Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC for default judgment as to all defendants (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC as to a certain Defendant (Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC as to certain Defendants (Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Signed by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 6/10/2019.Mailed notice.(jlj, ) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 8/12/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Motion hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiffs' motion for entry of a preliminary injunction #30 is granted. Enter order.Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC by Jake Michael Christensen (Christensen, Jake) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC by Abby Marie Neu (Neu, Abby) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Abby M. Neu)(Neu, Abby) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (mc, ) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials (mc, ) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (Attachments: #1 Trademark)(mc, ) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC by Allyson M. Martin (Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15770413. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Allyson M. Martin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Abby Marie Neu