This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/08/2020 at 09:04:54 (UTC).

Tonti Management Co., Inc. et al v. Soggy Doggie, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/09/2020 Tonti Management Co , Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Soggy Doggie, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is S. Kato Crews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02725

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

S. Kato Crews

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Tonti Management Co., Inc.

APMT, LLC

Defendants

M. Michele Tonti

Soggy Doggie, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William James Kelly, III

Shannon Marie Bell

Andrew R. Lee

Defendant Attorneys

Vandana Koelsch

Jennifer E. Schlatter

Andrew David Mendez

Patrick D. Vellone

Justin Paul Lemaire

 

Court Documents

101 #2

Proposed Order (PDF Only)

101 #1

Exhibit 1 - Redlined First Amended Complaint

#101

#100

#99

#98

#96

#95

#90

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit 7

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

282 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#101) MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint by Plaintiffs APMT, LLC, Tonti Management Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Redlined First Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Bell, Shannon) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#100) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew R. Lee on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Andrew R. Lee added to party APMT, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew R. Lee added to party Tonti Management Co., Inc.(pty:pla) (Lee, Andrew) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#99) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Justin Paul Lemaire on behalf of Soggy Doggie, LLC, M. Michele TontiAttorney Justin Paul Lemaire added to party Soggy Doggie, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Justin Paul Lemaire added to party M. Michele Tonti(pty:dft) (Lemaire, Justin) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#98) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew David Mendez on behalf of Soggy Doggie, LLC, M. Michele TontiAttorney Andrew David Mendez added to party Soggy Doggie, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew David Mendez added to party M. Michele Tonti(pty:dft) (Mendez, Andrew) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#97) Minute Order: Setting Status Conference. This matter was recently transferred from the Eastern District of Louisiana. As such, the Court is setting a Status Conference for 11-19-2020 at 9:00am in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The Parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before 11-12-2020. The Joint Status Report shall inform the Court of the following: (1) the Parties' activities in Discovery; (2) whether the Parties have any outstanding discovery disputes; (3) whether the Parties intend to file Summary Judgment Motions or Rule 702 Motions; and (4) the prospect of reaching a settlement in this matter. The Magistrate Judge Consent Form #90 is due 11-12-2020. Dial in information for the Status Conference is as follows:CONFERENCE CALL LINE: (888) 251-2909ACCESS CODE: 5662814# SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 09-28-2020. Text Only Entry (skclc2). (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#96) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Vandana Koelsch on behalf of Soggy Doggie, LLC, M. Michele TontiAttorney Vandana Koelsch added to party Soggy Doggie, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Vandana Koelsch added to party M. Michele Tonti(pty:dft) (Koelsch, Vandana) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#95) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jennifer E. Schlatter on behalf of Soggy Doggie, LLC, M. Michele TontiAttorney Jennifer E. Schlatter added to party Soggy Doggie, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer E. Schlatter added to party M. Michele Tonti(pty:dft) (Schlatter, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#94) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Patrick D. Vellone on behalf of Soggy Doggie, LLC, M. Michele TontiAttorney Patrick D. Vellone added to party Soggy Doggie, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick D. Vellone added to party M. Michele Tonti(pty:dft) (Vellone, Patrick) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#93) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Shannon Marie Bell on behalf of APMT, LLC, Tonti Management Co., Inc.Attorney Shannon Marie Bell added to party APMT, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Shannon Marie Bell added to party Tonti Management Co., Inc.(pty:pla) (Bell, Shannon) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#92) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by William James Kelly, III on behalf of APMT, LLC, Tonti Management Co., Inc.Attorney William James Kelly, III added to party APMT, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney William James Kelly, III added to party Tonti Management Co., Inc.(pty:pla) (Kelly, William) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
81 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss Case by Soggy Doggie, LLC, M. Michele Tonti. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Notice of Submission)(Mendez, Andrew) (Attachment 4 replaced on 1/7/2020) (cg). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.] (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Soggy Doggie, LLC answer due 1/14/2020; M. Michele Tonti answer due 1/6/2020. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 12/10/2019. (cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.] (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Soggy Doggie, LLC, M. Michele Tonti. (Attachments: #1 Certificate Pursuant to Local Rule 7.8, #2 Proposed Order)(Mendez, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.] (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (R. Doc. 4) is hereby DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE with leave to re-file at a later date, if needed, as stated herein. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 11/13/2019.(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.] (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION for Consent Order on Plaintiffs' Motion for Injunctive Relief by APMT, LLC, Tonti Management Co., Inc., Soggy Doggie, LLC and M. Michele Tonti (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rench, Tyler) Modified filers on 11/13/2019 (cg). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.] (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request/Statement of Oral Argument by All Plaintiffs regarding #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.] (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by APMT, LLC, Tonti Management Co., Inc.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Submission, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit 1: Declaration of S. Tonti (redacted), #4 Exhibit 1-A, #5 Exhibit 1-B, #6 Exhibit 1-C, #7 Exhibit 1-D, #8 Exhibit 1-E, #9 Exhibit 1-F, #10 Exhibit 1-G, #11 Exhibit 1-H, #12 Exhibit 1-I, #13 Exhibit 1-J, #14 Exhibit 2, #15 Exhibit 3, #16 Exhibit 4, #17 Exhibit 5, #18 Exhibit 6, #19 Exhibit 7, #20 Exhibit 8, #21 Exhibit 9)(Lee, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.] (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Soggy Doggie, LLC. (cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.] (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (cc) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.] (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7904254) filed by Tonti Management Co., Inc., APMT, LLC. (Attachments: #1Exhibit 1, #2Exhibit 2, #3Exhibit 3, #4Exhibit 4, #5Exhibit 5, #6Exhibit 6, #7Exhibit 7, #8Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Summons)Attorney Andrew Russell Lee added to party APMT, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew Russell Lee added to party Tonti Management Co., Inc.(pty:pla).(Lee, Andrew) (Attachment 9 replaced on 10/16/2019) (cg). (Attachment 10 replaced on 10/16/2019) (cg). Modified text, summons and civil cover sheet on 10/16/2019 (cg). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.] (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less