This case was last updated from PACER on 11/10/2020 at 09:39:27 (UTC).

Toney v. Western Regional Jail Medical Staff

Case Summary

On 09/11/2020 Toney filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Western Regional Jail Medical Staff. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cheryl A. Eifert and Robert C. Chambers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00596

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Cheryl A. Eifert

Presiding Judge

Robert C. Chambers

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rodney Toney

Barboursville, WV 25504

Defendants

Lt. Davis

Amanda McGrew

Major Fleming

Karl Aldridge

Medical Staff

Western Regional Jail Medical Staff

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 or submit to the Court a completed Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs, which includes the institution certificate; Plaintiff is notified that failure to pay the fee or submit the completed application as instructed within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order shall result in a recommendation that the complaint be dismissed; further directing Plaintiff to amend his complaint within forty-five (45) days and cure the deficiencies in pleading as indicated herein; Plaintiff is hereby given notice that a failure to amend the amended complaint as ordered may result in a recommendation that the complaint be dismissed for failure to state a claim and/or for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 9/24/2020. (cc: Plaintiff with Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs) (jsa)

#5

(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT by Rodney Toney against Western Regional Jail Medical Staff. (jsa)

#4

(#4) APPLICATION by Rodney Toney to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. (jsa)

#3

(#3) STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (jsa)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT. (jsa)

#1

(#1) MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER directing the Clerk to open a new civil action for each of the plaintiffs from civil action 3:20-cv-592 as listed herein; further directing the Clerk to provide each Plaintiff with a form complaint under 1983 and an Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs; directing each plaintiff to complete, sign, and file a complaint on his own behalf, stating factual allegations pertinent to his experience at the Western Regional Jail and Correctional Facility, and to either pay the $400 filing fee or submit the fully completed Application within twenty days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 9/11/2020. (cc: Plaintiff with form complaint under 1983 and Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs) (jsa)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 or submit to the Court a completed Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs, which includes the institution certificate; Plaintiff is notified that failure to pay the fee or submit the completed application as instructed within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order shall result in a recommendation that the complaint be dismissed; further directing Plaintiff to amend his complaint within forty-five (45) days and cure the deficiencies in pleading as indicated herein; Plaintiff is hereby given notice that a failure to amend the amended complaint as ordered may result in a recommendation that the complaint be dismissed for failure to state a claim and/or for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 9/24/2020. (cc: Plaintiff with Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs) (jsa)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT by Rodney Toney against Western Regional Jail Medical Staff. (jsa)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPLICATION by Rodney Toney to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. (jsa)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketCASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (jsa)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT. (jsa)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER directing the Clerk to open a new civil action for each of the plaintiffs from civil action 3:20-cv-592 as listed herein; further directing the Clerk to provide each Plaintiff with a form complaint under 1983 and an Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs; directing each plaintiff to complete, sign, and file a complaint on his own behalf, stating factual allegations pertinent to his experience at the Western Regional Jail and Correctional Facility, and to either pay the $400 filing fee or submit the fully completed Application within twenty days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 9/11/2020. (cc: Plaintiff with form complaint under 1983 and Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs) (jsa)

    Read MoreRead Less