This case was last updated from PACER on 04/25/2020 at 09:03:50 (UTC).

Tomshack v. Wilkie et al

Case Summary

On 02/25/2020 Tomshack filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Wilkie. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Dakota District. The Judge overseeing this case is Roberto A. Lange. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-04037

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Dakota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Roberto A. Lange

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kevin A. Tomshack

Defendants

Robert Wilkie

United States Department of Veterans Affairs

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sara E. Schroeder

Attorney at Hagen, Wilka and Archer, P.C.

600 South Main Avenue, Suite 102, Po Box 964

Sioux Falls, SD 57104

Thomas K. Wilka

Attorney at Hagen, Wilka and Archer, P.C.

Po Box 964, 334-0005, Fax: 334-4814

Sioux Falls, SD 57101-0964

Defendant Attorney

Alison J. Ramsdell

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office (Sioux Falls, SD)

Po Box 2638

Sioux Falls, SD 57101-2638

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by United States Department of Veterans Affairs, Robert Wilkie . (Ramsdell, Alison) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

#4

(#4) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by Kevin A. Tomshack. (Wilka, Thomas) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Alison J. Ramsdell on behalf of All Defendants. (Ramsdell, Alison) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

2 #2

AO85 Form

2 #1

Summons Issued

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to USA. Summmonses, AO 85, and Rule 73 Memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery to plaintiffs attorney. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 AO85 Form)(JLS) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400.00 fee paid, receipt# SDX400051868) filed by Kevin A. Tomshack. (JLS) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by United States Department of Veterans Affairs, Robert Wilkie . (Ramsdell, Alison) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by Kevin A. Tomshack. (Wilka, Thomas) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Alison J. Ramsdell on behalf of All Defendants. (Ramsdell, Alison) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to USA. Summmonses, AO 85, and Rule 73 Memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery to plaintiffs attorney. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 AO85 Form)(JLS) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400.00 fee paid, receipt# SDX400051868) filed by Kevin A. Tomshack. (JLS) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less