This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/13/2020 at 07:22:21 (UTC).

Tompkins v. United States Dept of Veterans Affairs et al

Case Summary

On 08/14/2020 Tompkins filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against United States Dept of Veterans Affairs. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Scott L. Palk. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00818

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Scott L. Palk

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Tompkins

Defendants

Kristopher Wade Vlosich

Ralph T Gigliotti

United States Dept of Veterans Affairs

Robert Wilkie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Danny K Shadid

Attorney at Riggs Abney Neal Turpen Orbison Lewis-OKC

528 Nw 12Th St

Oklahoma City, OK 73103

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE of Counsel Certificate of Compliance by Danny K Shadid on behalf of John Tompkins (Shadid, Danny) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Tompkins. Kristopher Wade Vlosich(Individually) served on 9/24/2020; Kristopher Wade Vlosich(Official Capacity) served on 9/24/2020. (Shadid, Danny) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Tompkins. Ralph T Gigliotti(Individually) served on 9/29/2020; Ralph T Gigliotti(Official Capacity) served on 9/29/2020. (Shadid, Danny) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Tompkins. Robert Wilkie(Official Capacity ) served on 9/28/2020. (Shadid, Danny) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Tompkins. United States Dept of Veterans Affairs served on 9/28/2020. (Shadid, Danny) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Danny K Shadid on behalf of John Tompkins (Shadid, Danny) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Receipt for Money Received from John Tompkins in the amount of $400, receipt number OKW500081471 regarding #1 Complaint,,, (dtb) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. (rb) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by John Tompkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1--Vlosich letter, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2--letters of VA medical reviewers, #3 Exhibit 3--letter of August 24, 2017, RE reinstatement of medical privileges, #4 Exhibit 4--Letter of Proposed Separation, #5 Exhibit 5--Shadid response letter of November 14, 2017, #6 Exhibit 6--plaintiff's additional response letter of November 14, 2017, #7 Exhibit 7--Vlosich letter of August 17, 2017, #8 Exhibit 8--Shadid letter of November 20, 2017, #9 Exhibit 9--Vlosich letter of November 20, 2017, #10 Exhibit 10--Vlosich discharge letter of November 21, 2017, #11 Exhibit 11--Formal Grievance letter of December 6, 2017, #12 Exhibit 12--Gigliotti letter of August 17, 2017, #13 Exhibit 13--Greivance Examiner's Report and Recommendations, #14 Exhibit 14--Gigliotti Decision Letter, #15 Appendix Appendix A VA Handbook excerpt, #16 Civil Cover Sheet)(rb) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Danny K Shadid