This case was last updated from PACER on 10/27/2019 at 08:48:42 (UTC).

TOMPKINS v. PRIMECARE MEDICAL INC. et al

Case Summary

On 08/28/2019 TOMPKINS filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against PRIMECARE MEDICAL INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Maureen P. Kelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01089

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maureen P. Kelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRENT TOMPKINS

Mercer, PA 16137

Defendants

ERNA CRAIG

THREE JOHN DOE DEFENDANTS

PRIMECARE MEDICAL INC.

EIGHT JOHN DOE DEFENDANTS

JOSEPH REICHARD

C.O. PETERS

KENNETH RODGERS

C.O. VASCONNI

C.O. COCHRAN

C.O. SHERMAN

JOHN DOE 1

 

Court Documents

21 #1

Envelope

#21

(#21) MOTION for Medical Examination by TRENT TOMPKINS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jd) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

#20

(#20) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Certificate of Merit by TRENT TOMPKINS. (jd) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

#19

(#19) Remark: Document received titled Facts Page (jd) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

18 #3

Envelope

18 #2

Exhibit

18 #1

Exhibit

#18

(#18) MOTION for Clarification as to #6 Order, by TRENT TOMPKINS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope) (jd) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

7 #1

Envelope

#6

(#18) MOTION for Clarification as to #6 Order, by TRENT TOMPKINS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope) (jd) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

#5

(#5) Remark: Letter from Plaintiff to Clerk's Office received on or about 9/6/2019 forwarded to Chambers. This letter requests the Clerk's Office to issue blank subpoenas for the Plaintiff in this matter. Original placed in Chamber's file. (tjw) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

4 #1

Envelope

#4

(#4) Remark: Letter received from Plaintiff in Clerk's Office on or about 9/5/2019 which was forwarded to Chambers. This letter requests the Clerk of Courts issue subpoenas in this matter related to discovery. It is noted that contained in this letter were subpoenas for both Erna Craig and Mercer County Prison. Originals, including noted subpoenas, have been placed in Chamber's file. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (tjw) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Order, Plaintiff is directed to file an Amended Complaint no later than September 27, 2019. Failure to do so may result in the case being dismissed for failure to prosecute or the Complaint could be dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 09/03/2019. A copy of this Notice, Order, and a blank copy of the Civil Rights complaint form have been mailed to Plaintiff's address of record. (tjw) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #2

Envelope

1 #1

Receipt

#1

(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint. The Clerk of Court is directed to file the Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 09/25/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. A copy of this Order has been mailed to Plaintiff's address of record. (tjw) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ORDER advising Plaintiff of his failure to comply with Local Civil Rule 7.D. requiring that all motions must be accompanied by a proposed order of court. Accordingly, Plaintiff is directed to promptly file a proposed order regarding both Plaintiff's #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Certificate of Merit and Plaintiff's #21 Motion for Medical Examination. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 10/24/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. A copy of this Order has been mailed to Plaintiff's address of record. (tjw) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) It is apparent that Plaintiff has initiated service of process on Defendants, ECF No. 19. Accordingly, it is HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's #18 Motion for Clarification, is denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 10/24/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. A copy of this Order has been mailed to Plaintiff's address of record. (tjw) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MOTION for Medical Examination by TRENT TOMPKINS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jd) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Certificate of Merit by TRENT TOMPKINS. (jd) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Remark: Document received titled Facts Page (jd) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MOTION for Clarification as to #6 Order, by TRENT TOMPKINS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope) (jd) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) AMENDED COMPLAINT against COCHRAN, ERNA CRAIG, JOHN DOE 1, PETERS, PRIMECARE MEDICAL INC., JOSEPH REICHARD, KENNETH RODGERS, SHERMAN, VASCONNI, filed by TRENT TOMPKINS. (jd) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER granting #15 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint. The Clerk of Court is directed to file the attached as the Second Amended Complaint. A copy of this order will be mailed to Plaintiff at his address of record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 10/17/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (Kelly, Maureen) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION to Amend/Correct #10 Amended Complaint by TRENT TOMPKINS. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED AMENDED COMPLAINT, #2 Envelope) (jd) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER denying #13 Plaintiff's Motion for Examination by Dr. Bruce Chambers. The motion is denied for two reasons. First, Plaintiff does not state the reason or purpose of the examination. Second, this case is at a very early stage and defendants have not yet been served nor have defense counsel entered their appearances. As such, the Court has not yet set a schedule for fact discovery or expert reports/discovery. A copy of this order will be mailed to Plaintiff at his address of record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 10/4/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (Kelly, Maureen) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT against ERNA CRAIG, PRIMECARE MEDICAL INC., filed by TRENT TOMPKINS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pleadings, #2 Exhibit Greivance Steps Taken) (jd) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint. The Clerk of Court is directed to file the Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 09/25/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. A copy of this Order has been mailed to Plaintiff's address of record. (tjw) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by TRENT TOMPKINS. (Attachments: #1 AMENDED COMPLAINT, #2 PLEADINGS, #3 GRIEVANCE STEPS TAKEN, #4 Envelope) (jd) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by TRENT TOMPKINS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jd) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Order of Court, the Clerk of Court Is ORDERED to not send any subpoenas to the Plaintiff until further order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 09/09/2019. A copy of this Notice, Order, and Docket Sheet have been mailed to Plaintiff's address of record. (tjw) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Remark: Letter from Plaintiff to Clerk's Office received on or about 9/6/2019 forwarded to Chambers. This letter requests the Clerk's Office to issue blank subpoenas for the Plaintiff in this matter. Original placed in Chamber's file. (tjw) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Remark: Letter received from Plaintiff in Clerk's Office on or about 9/5/2019 which was forwarded to Chambers. This letter requests the Clerk of Courts issue subpoenas in this matter related to discovery. It is noted that contained in this letter were subpoenas for both Erna Craig and Mercer County Prison. Originals, including noted subpoenas, have been placed in Chamber's file. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (tjw) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Order, Plaintiff is directed to file an Amended Complaint no later than September 27, 2019. Failure to do so may result in the case being dismissed for failure to prosecute or the Complaint could be dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 09/03/2019. A copy of this Notice, Order, and a blank copy of the Civil Rights complaint form have been mailed to Plaintiff's address of record. (tjw) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by TRENT TOMPKINS. (jd) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against ERNA CRAIG, PRIMECARE MEDICAL INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 24668058072), filed by TRENT TOMPKINS. (Attachments: #1 Receipt, #2 Envelope) (jd) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PrimeCare Medical, Inc. is a litigant