This case was last updated from PACER on 01/03/2020 at 07:45:39 (UTC).

Tomorrow Murchison v. CTL Transportation, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/04/2019 Tomorrow Murchison filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CTL Transportation, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey V Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00368

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey V Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

Tomorrow Murchison

CTL Transportation, LLC

Comcar Industries, Inc.

L.J. Banks

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kevin Michael McCormack

Attorney at McCormack Law Office

12603 Southwest Fwy, Ste 688

Stafford, TX 77477

Nick Maram

Attorney at Nick Maram & Associates PC

Po Box 630127

Houston, TX 77263

Rory Stephen Alter

Attorney at Nick Maram & Asoc PC

811 North Loop West

Houston, TX 77008

Defendant Attorney

Kelly Mullins Haas

Attorney at Schouest, Bamdas, Soshea & BenMaier PLLC

1001 Mckinney Street, Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CTL Transportation, LLC, Comcar Industries, Inc., filed.(Haas, Kelly) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by CTL Transportation, LLC, Comcar Industries, Inc., L.J. Banks, filed.(Haas, Kelly) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Plaintiff, filed.(BrendaLacy, 4) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#4

(#4) Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Rory Stephen Alter as to Tomorrow Murchison re: #2 Order for Initial Conference - FORM,, filed. [Updated address per #1 Notice of Removal] (SarahShelby, 4) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#2

(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/19/2020 at 9:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(agould, 3) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

1 #6

Exhibit

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Brazoria County District Court, case number 104493-CV (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23500474) filed by L.J. Banks, Comcar Industries, Inc., CTL Transportation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Haas, Kelly) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CTL Transportation, LLC, Comcar Industries, Inc., filed.(Haas, Kelly) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to Complaint by CTL Transportation, LLC, Comcar Industries, Inc., L.J. Banks, filed.(Haas, Kelly) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • *** Re-mailed #2 Order to Rory Alter at 811 North Loop address, filed. (SarahShelby, 4) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Plaintiff, filed.(BrendaLacy, 4) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Rory Stephen Alter as to Tomorrow Murchison re: #2 Order for Initial Conference - FORM,, filed. [Updated address per #1 Notice of Removal] (SarahShelby, 4) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/19/2020 at 9:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(agould, 3) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Brazoria County District Court, case number 104493-CV (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23500474) filed by L.J. Banks, Comcar Industries, Inc., CTL Transportation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Haas, Kelly) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Comcar Industries Inc is a litigant