This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/19/2020 at 09:03:17 (UTC).

Tommy v. Buckner Retirement Services Inc

Case Summary

On 02/19/2020 Tommy filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Buckner Retirement Services Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sam R Cummings. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00401

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sam R Cummings

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shellyann C Tommy

Defendant

Buckner Retirement Services Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Charles Leonard Scalise

Attorney at Ross & Scalise, P.C.

1104 San Antonio Street

Austin, TX 78701

Steven Robert Samples

Attorney at Samples Ames PLLC

2727 Lbj Freeway, Suite 922

Dallas, TX 75234

Daniel Bret Ross

Attorney at Ross Scalise Law Group

1104 San Antonio Street

Austin, TX 78701

Defendant Attorney

John L Ross

Attorney at Thompson Coe Cousins & Irons LLP

700 North Pearl Street, 25Th Floor

Dallas, TX 75201-2832

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 7/15/2020. Discovery due by 7/26/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 7/15/2020. Motions due by 3/15/2021. Jury Trial set for 8/16/2021 09:00 AM before Senior Judge Sam R Cummings. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 3/17/2020) (chmb) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Buckner Retirement Services Inc. (Ross, John) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Buckner Retirement Services Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney John L Ross added to party Buckner Retirement Services Inc(pty:dft) (Ross, John) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Buckner Retirement Services Inc ; served on 2/21/2020. (Scalise, Charles) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Buckner Retirement Services Inc. (hml) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Shellyann C. Tommy. (Scalise, Charles) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Shellyann C. Tommy. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10634388) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Scalise, Charles) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 7/15/2020. Discovery due by 7/26/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 7/15/2020. Motions due by 3/15/2021. Jury Trial set for 8/16/2021 09:00 AM before Senior Judge Sam R Cummings. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 3/17/2020) (chmb) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Buckner Retirement Services Inc. (Ross, John) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Buckner Retirement Services Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney John L Ross added to party Buckner Retirement Services Inc(pty:dft) (Ross, John) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Buckner Retirement Services Inc ; served on 2/21/2020. (Scalise, Charles) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Buckner Retirement Services Inc. (hml) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Shellyann C. Tommy. (Scalise, Charles) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Shellyann C. Tommy. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10634388) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Scalise, Charles) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer John L Ross