This case was last updated from PACER on 01/17/2020 at 07:07:24 (UTC).

Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John Robert Blakey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-07583

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Robert Blakey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC

Defendants

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

lekssu _0

Shop5044021 Store

Connor's Life Store

Katherine Palazzolo

ststrade.top

palwat0

David Roller

ranggkanv _0

Shop5277001 Store

Vickie Ozuna

Wanda Burk

Shop5407057 Store

mamachantel.net

tondwiyon-0

yawtrade.top

Jan Fritch

Shop5379138 Store

exzoticase

162 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amy Crout Ziegler

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Dr., Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

RiKaleigh C. Johnson

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Justin R. Gaudio

Attorney at Greer Burns & Crain Ltd

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Abby Marie Neu

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain

300 S Wacker, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Jake Michael Christensen

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain

300 S Wacker Drive, #2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Isaku Begert

Attorney at Greer, Burns And Crain, Ltd.

300 S Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#45

(#45) NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for entry of default, motion for default judgment #43 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 1/21/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

44 #2

Exhibit 1

44 #1

Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio

#44

(#44) MEMORANDUM by Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC in support of motion for entry of default, motion for default judgment #43 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#43

(#43) MOTION by Plaintiff Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC for entry of default as to all Defendants, MOTION by Plaintiff Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC for default judgment as to all Defendants (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#42

(#42) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs as to a Certain Defendant Online Marketplace Account (Johnson, RiKaleigh) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#41

(#41) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Based upon the filing of the notice of voluntary dismissal #33 Defendant, RFO is dismissed without prejudice. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#40

(#40) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 12/19/2019. Mailed notice(pk, ) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#33

(#41) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Based upon the filing of the notice of voluntary dismissal #33 Defendant, RFO is dismissed without prejudice. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#6

(#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC by RiKaleigh C. Johnson (Johnson, RiKaleigh) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

1 #3

Schedule A

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16447781. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Schedule A)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

71 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for entry of default, motion for default judgment #43 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 1/21/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) MEMORANDUM by Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC in support of motion for entry of default, motion for default judgment #43 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) MOTION by Plaintiff Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC for entry of default as to all Defendants, MOTION by Plaintiff Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC for default judgment as to all Defendants (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs as to a Certain Defendant Online Marketplace Account (Johnson, RiKaleigh) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Based upon the filing of the notice of voluntary dismissal #33 Defendant, RFO is dismissed without prejudice. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 12/19/2019. Mailed notice(pk, ) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion for preliminary injunction #34 is granted. The parties are not required to appear. Mailed notice (ewf, ) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC by Isaku Begert (Begert, Isaku) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 12/18/2019, answer due 1/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Isaku Begert)(Begert, Isaku) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #34 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 12/20/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials. (aee, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (Attachments: #1 Trademarks) (aee, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (aee, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, ) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC by RiKaleigh C. Johnson (Johnson, RiKaleigh) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16447781. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Schedule A)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.